Original Case: 4:20-cv-03297

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cvpri-01271
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2022
Terminated:May 18, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 19, 2023 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
STRESS ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Christopher McKeon
Saunders McKeon PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STYLWAN IP HOLDING, LLC
Represented By
William Peterson Ramey III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STYLWAN, INC.
Represented By
William Peterson Ramey III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STYLWAN IIT, LLC
Represented By
William Peterson Ramey III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2023 4:33 AM EDT
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 12/12/2022. [892202] Entry of Appearance due 01/04/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/04/2023. Docketing Statement due 01/04/2023. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 02/21/2023. [KMH] [Entered: 12/21/2022 03:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 26 pgs Civil Case Docketed
2 2 Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 23-1269 Lead with 23-1271 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [892205] 23-1269 23-1271 [KMH] [Entered: 12/21/2022 03:51 PM]
Related: [-]