Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: Douglas L Micko
Case #: 0:22-cv-03140
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2022
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 19, 2023 6:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Bio-Techne Corporation
Represented By
Janet M Olawsky
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Ashley R. Thronson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Teresa M Thompson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Defendant
Research and Diagnostic Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Janet M Olawsky
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Ashley R. Thronson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Teresa M Thompson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian J. Manick
Represented By
Sarah R Jewell
River Valley Law, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bio-Techne Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Janet M Olawsky
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Ashley R. Thronson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Teresa M Thompson
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
98 98 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 05/30 1:31 PM
JUDGMENT(CLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
97 97 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/29 3:25 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 5/29/2024.(DMD)
Related: [-]
96 96 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 05/29 11:45 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re95 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Dorr, Janet)
Related: [-]
95 95 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/29 11:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bio-Techne Corporation, Research and Diagnostic Systems, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Brian J. Manick. (Dorr, Janet)
Related: [-]
94 94 minutes Status Conference Wed 05/29 10:25 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 5/29/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Carla Bebault St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 10:03 am 10:10 am Total Time: 7 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Sarah Jewell For Defendant(s): Janet Dorr; Ashley Thronson; Shane Bohnen PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. For the reasons discussed at the hearing, the parties must file their stipulation of dismissal by 5:00 p.m. today, May 29, 2024. (DMD)
Related: [-]
93 93 minutes Status Conference Wed 05/29 10:13 AM
FILED IN ERROR. (Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 5/29/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Carla Bebault St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 10:03 am 10:10 am Total Time: 7 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Sarah Jewell For Defendant(s): Janet Dorr; Ashley Thronson; Shane Bohnen PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. (DMD) Modified text on 5/29/2024 (CLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
92 92 notice Notice to Attorney Tue 05/28 12:23 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The motion hearing set for 5/29/24 at 10:00 a.m. will be held via Zoom and will begin with discussing the parties' joint continuance request (Doc. No. 91). The parties must be prepared to discuss their joint letter and whether good cause exists to continue the summary judgment hearing. If no good cause is shown, the hearing will proceed to arguments on summary judgment. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
91 91 misc Letter to District Judge Fri 05/24 10:25 AM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Bio-Techne Corporation, Research and Diagnostic Systems, Inc. Confirming Settlement; Jointly Signed by Plaintiff . (Dorr, Janet)
Related: [-]