Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:22-cv-00453
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2022
Case in other court:New York Northern, 1:19-cv-00201
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2023 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Embrace Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By
Marjorie J. Peerce
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos George Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos G. Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher Anthony Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Patrick N. Sampson
Adler Pollock And Sheehan
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Hardiman
Represented By
Marjorie J. Peerce
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos George Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos G. Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher Anthony Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Patrick N. Sampson
Adler Pollock And Sheehan
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Lamy
Represented By
Marjorie J. Peerce
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos George Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos G. Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher Anthony Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Patrick N. Sampson
Adler Pollock And Sheehan
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kurt Noyce
Represented By
Marjorie J. Peerce
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos George Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Constantinos G. Panagopoulos
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christopher Anthony Hatfield
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Patrick N. Sampson
Adler Pollock And Sheehan
contact info
Patricia K. Rocha
Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Souza
Represented By
Michael J. Lingle
Nixon, Peabody Law Firm - Rochester Office
contact info
John W. Black
Black & Buffone PLLC
contact info
Samuel J. Buffone, Jr.
Black & Buffone PLLC
contact info
Jonathan W. Ferris
Thomas & Solomon LLP
contact info
J. Nelson Thomas
Thomas, Solomon Law Firm
contact info
Samuel John Buffone, Jr.
Black & Buffone PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend Complaint and giving her 14 days from the entry of this order to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/28/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER denying 121 Motion to Amend and to Certify for Appeal (Motion for Reconsideration), and, granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/29/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
GPO Aug 28 2024
ORDER granting in part 139 Motion to Compel; granting in part 140 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/28/2024. (Saucier, Martha)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/16 2:27 PM
TEXT ORDER granting179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses/Replies re:170 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Relator's Experts ,167 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,165 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,169 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings; Responses due by 6/9/2025; Replies due by 7/30/2025 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/16/2025. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 5/16/2025: date typo corrected (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
179 179 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/15 10:38 AM
Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to170 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Relator's Experts ,165 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,169 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ,167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah Souza. Responses due by 5/29/2025. (Thomas, James)
Related: [-]