Oregon District Court
Judge:Youlee Yim You
Case #: 3:22-cv-01973
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2022
Terminated:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2023 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Carlton Farms
Represented By
Jennifer A. Street
Glascock Street Waxler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carlton Packing Company, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer A. Street
Glascock Street Waxler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan B. Jenne
Represented By
John M. Coletti, III
Paulson Coletti
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
order Dismissal -Terminate Case Thu 06/20 7:48 AM
ORDER : The parties have submitted a Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) dismissing the case with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. This operates to dismiss the case; no court order is necessary. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
42 42 oth_doc Proposed Order or Judgment Tue 06/18 9:50 AM
Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
41 41 oth_doc Proposed Order or Judgment Tue 06/18 9:48 AM
Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
40 40 oth_doc Joint Status Report Wed 05/29 2:34 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Fri 05/10 7:34 AM
Order: The Court is advised that the parties are currently scheduled for a mediation on 5/23/2024. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 5/30/2024 reporting on the outcome of the mediation and the status of the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
38 38 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 04/08 8:22 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed on 4/8/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
37 37 motion Protective Order Fri 04/05 3:54 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
36 36 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 03/29 2:34 PM
Answer to35 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Carlton Packing Company, LLC, Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
35 35 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Thu 03/14 3:50 PM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by Alan B. Jenne against All Defendants. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
minute Motion Hearing Held Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition Fri 03/08 10:03 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings : Telephonic motion hearing held on March 8, 2024. For reasons explained on the record, plaintiff's Motion to Amend18 is granted in that, within seven days, plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint adding a demand for punitive damages supported by the factual allegations described in his motion to amend. Dain J. Paulson present as counsel for plaintiff. Jennifer A. Street present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Thu 02/15 9:01 AM
ORDER : The court grants Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines31 and sets the following case schedule: Fact discovery shall be completed by April 1, 2024. The deadline to amend/file all pleadings is April 1, 2024. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by May 2, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 02/15 3:43 PM
Scheduling Order : SETTING a Telephonic Motion Hearing for Friday, March 8, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint18 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 02/14 4:21 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
30 30 oth_sup Declaration Thu 02/08 4:22 PM
Declaration of John Coletti In Support of Plaintiff's Reply . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Coletti, John)
Related: [-] Motion - Miscellaneous18 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sheppick,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Lowe,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Geist,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Totman,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Jenne,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Photos
29 29 resp Reply to Motion Thu 02/08 4:17 PM
Reply in Support to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 18 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
28 28 notice Address Change Mon 02/05 6:40 PM
Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 01/31 2:47 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 18 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 01/31 3:02 PM
ORDER : Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply26 is granted. Plaintiff's reply to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint18 is due by February 8, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
25 25 oth_sup Declaration Thu 01/18 4:56 PM
Declaration of Daniel Sheppick in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-] Response to Motion23 .
24 24 oth_sup Declaration Thu 01/18 4:53 PM
Declaration of Jennifer A. Street in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-] Response to Motion23 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-8
23 23 resp Response to Motion Thu 01/18 4:44 PM
Response to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 18 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/29 9:40 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Defendants. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/29 10:10 AM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time21 is GRANTED. Deadline for defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint is extended to 1/18/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
20 20 notice Attorney Association Fri 12/22 9:02 AM
Notice of Association of Attorney of John M. Coletti, III, Dain J. Paulson appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs . Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
19 19 oth_sup Declaration Thu 12/21 4:04 PM
Declaration of John Coletti . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Coletti, John)
Related: [-] Motion - Miscellaneous18 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amd Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sheppick,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Lowe,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Geist,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Totman,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Jenne
18 18 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Thu 12/21 3:53 PM
Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Fri 09/08 9:12 AM
ORDER : The court grants Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines16 and sets the following case schedule: Fact discovery shall be completed by February 15, 2024. The deadline to file all pleadings is February 15, 2024. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by March 18, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 08/30 2:16 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 06/14 9:16 AM
ORDER : The court grants Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines14 and sets the following case schedule: Fact discovery shall be completed by November 17, 2023. The deadline to file all pleadings is November 17, 2023. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by December 19, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 06/13 4:00 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
13 13 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 03/23 1:01 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
minute Rule 16 Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 03/22 12:11 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings : Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on March 22, 2023. The court grants Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines11 and sets the following case schedule: Fact discovery shall be completed by July 20, 2023. The deadline to amend pleadings is July 20, 2023. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by August 21, 2023. The joint ADR report is waived. For information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/consent. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-10 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration. John Coletti, III present as counsel for plaintiff. Jennifer Street present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 03/14 4:03 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 02/27 11:52 AM
Scheduling Order : SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, March 22, 2023, at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
9 9 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Fri 02/10 3:10 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Carlton Packing Company, LLC served on 1/19/2023, answer due on 2/9/2023. (dino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
8 8 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/09 5:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/09 4:49 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Carlton Packing Company, LLC, Carlton Farms. (Street, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Fri 01/27 1:10 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Carlton Farms served on 1/19/2023, answer due on 2/9/2023. (dino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 9:04 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Carlton Farms, Carlton Packing Company, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 01/19 8:39 AM
Amended Proposed Summons Carlton Packing Company, LLC Filed by Alan B. Jenne. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 01/19 8:38 AM
Amended Proposed Summons Carlton Farms Filed by Alan B. Jenne. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 12/22 2:01 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/21/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/22/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kgc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/22 10:58 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8764658 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Alan B Jenne against All Defendants. (Coletti, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons