Fan v. State of Nevada ex. rel. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education, on behalf of the University of Nevada, Reno
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00560 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 29, 2023 8:01 PM PDT |
Defendant
State of Nevada ex. rel. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education, on behalf of the University of Nevada, Reno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Fei Fei Fan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
notice
Notice Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/08 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Fei Fei Fan. without prejudice . (Mains, Theresa) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 10/26 10:33 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.24 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Response re ECF No.19 Motion to Dismiss is due by 11/9/2023 . Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
motion
Stipulation
Wed 10/25 1:17 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re19 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Fei Fei Fan. (Mains, Theresa) (extend) (sumjgm) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 10/25 12:43 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Ryan J. Cann terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Motion Substitute Attorney/Party
Tue 10/24 2:00 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Theresa Mains in for Attorney Ryan J. Cann by Plaintiff Fei Fei Fan. Responses due by 11/7/2023. (Mains, Theresa) |
|
misc
QC Notice
Tue 10/24 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No.20 Notice. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No.20 Notice as a Motion. (no image attached) (KF) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination
Mon 10/23 6:39 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
8
pgs
motion
Motion Dismiss
Thu 10/12 9:16 AM
MOTION to Dismiss18 Amended Complaint, by Defendant State of Nevada ex. rel. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education, on behalf of the University of Nevada, Reno. Responses due by 10/26/2023.(Christensen, Deverie) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 05/18 4:52 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State of Nevada ex. rel. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education, on behalf of the University of Nevada, Reno by Fei Fei Fan. No changes to parties. (Cann, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 51 pgs First Amended Complaint | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/04 10:00 AM
ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT : Amended complaint due by Thursday, 5/18/2023 . Failure to file an amended complaint will result in a recommendation to dismiss this case for failure to follow the Court's orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER - In light of the Order Granting the Stipulation for Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, (ECF No.15 ), the Amended Complaint shall be filed by no later than Wednesday, April 5, 2023 , consistent with Local Rule 15-1(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL) | |
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 03/22 11:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF No.14 ) - IT IS SO ORDERED: the Clerk of Court shall amend the caption to list as the Defendant: State of Nevada ex. rel. Board of Regents of the Nevada System of Higher Education, on behalf of the University of Nevada, Reno. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/22/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
order
Order
Wed 03/22 3:40 PM
ORDER - In light of the Order Granting the Stipulation for Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, (ECF No.15 ), the Amended Complaint shall be filed by no later than Wednesday, April 5, 2023 , consistent with Local Rule 15-1(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation
Tue 03/21 4:29 PM
STIPULATION for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint by Defendant Nevada System of Higher Education. (Christensen, Deverie) (other) (pleading) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/16 5:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fei Fei Fan re2 Summons Issued. Nevada System of Higher Education served on 1/6/2023. (Cann, Ryan) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 02/03 4:28 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (ECF No.7 ) - Accordingly, because it is unclear whether NSHE has even been served in this case, the motion to amend, (ECF No.7 ), is DENIED , with leave to refile, with evidence the executed summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/3/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00560-RCJ-CLB . (no image attached) (WJ) | |
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Thu 02/02 7:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00560-RCJ-CLB . (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/1/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. It is requested that, given the legal and factual overlap between the two cases, both 3:22-cv-00560 and 3:21-cv-00458 are reassigned to the same District and Magistrate Judges. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KJM) | |
9 | 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00560-LRH-CLB . (no image attached) (WJ) | |
8 | 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/1/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. It is requested that, given the legal and factual overlap between the two cases, both 3:22-cv-00560 and 3:21-cv-00458 are reassigned to the same District and Magistrate Judges. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PJM) | |
minord
Minute Order Recusal
Wed 02/01 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/1/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. It is requested that, given the legal and factual overlap between the two cases, both 3:22-cv-00560 and 3:21-cv-00458 are reassigned to the same District and Magistrate Judges. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PJM) |
||
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Wed 02/01 3:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00560-LRH-CLB . (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
minord
Minute Order Recusal
Wed 02/01 4:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/1/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. It is requested that, given the legal and factual overlap between the two cases, both 3:22-cv-00560 and 3:21-cv-00458 are reassigned to the same District and Magistrate Judges. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KJM) |
||
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
motion
Motion Amend/Correct
Fri 01/27 9:42 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fei Fei Fan. Responses due by 2/10/2023.(Cann, Ryan) (pleading) |
|
Att: 1 51 pgs Exhibit Copy of Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Reassign Judge
Wed 01/25 2:12 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Case No. 3:22-CV-00560-LRH-CLB is reassigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla L. Baldwin. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00560-ART-CLB . Clerk shall change the file and docket(s) to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/24/2023 and Judge Anne R Traum on 1/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
notice
Clerks Notice Assign District Judge to Civil Case
Thu 01/19 7:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Thu 12/29 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney is not longer assigned as settlement hearing judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr for all further proceedings regarding settlement hearing. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
notice
Notice Assignment of Case to MJ & Consent Form
Wed 12/28 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 1/18/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (HKL) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 12/28 11:13 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (HKL) |
||
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/27 7:46 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nevada System of Higher Education. (DRM) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
49
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/22 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Nevada System of Higher Education (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7154783) by Fei Fei Fan. Proof of service due by 3/22/2023. (Cann, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |