Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 2:22-cv-00252
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2022
Terminated:Oct 17, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2023 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Solvay USA, Inc.
Represented By
Rachel P. Kaercher
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Nichole Chang Novosel
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Huff
Represented By
Amanda Maree Brookhuis
The Kirby G. Smith Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Kirby Smith
The Kirby G. Smith Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
19 19 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/17 9:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Huff. (Brookhuis, Amanda)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 10/17 10:21 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING19 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party bearing its own costs and fees. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/17 10:22 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller terminated from case. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
18 18 4 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 07/13 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving the15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/13/2023. (rsg)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Thu 07/13 11:09 AM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/13/2023. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Wed 07/12 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Solvay USA, Inc..(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
15 15 17 pgs misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 07/12 2:06 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Solvay USA, Inc.. (Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/06 10:24 AM
(Minute entry) ORDER granting14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including 7/13/2023 in which to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Serve Initial Disclosures . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/6/2023. (clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/05 12:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Serve Initial Disclosures by Solvay USA, Inc..(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 06/06 3:07 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by Solvay USA, Inc.. Discovery ends on 11/3/2023.(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/30 3:29 PM
(Minute entry) ORDER granting12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re10 Amended Complaint, , Solvay USA, Inc. Answer due 6/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 5/30/2023. (clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 05/26 3:09 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re10 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by Solvay USA, Inc..(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/16 11:38 AM
ORDER DENYING as moot Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff;s Complaint. (Doc. 5). Defendant is DIRECTED to file a responsive pleading or motion to Plaintiff;s Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 05/16/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/15 11:27 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Solvay USA, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Huff.(Brookhuis, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, May 08, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/08 7:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Huff. (Brookhuis, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/05 11:17 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solvay USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Solvay Holding Inc. for Solvay USA, Inc.. (Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/02 11:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and Related Deadlines [Doc. 6]. Tt is further ordered that the parties shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within seven days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 05/02/2023. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
6 6 motion Stay Mon 05/01 1:09 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Related Deadlines with Brief In Support by Solvay USA, Inc..(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/01 12:47 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Solvay USA, Inc..(Kaercher, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/01 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Chang Novosel on behalf of Solvay USA, Inc. (Novosel, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/08 9:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Huff. Solvay USA, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (Brookhuis, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 12/22 12:34 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Solvay USA, Inc.. (ddm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/22 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Christopher Huff. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12279743)(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet