Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Referred: Andrew M Edison
Case #: 4:22-cv-04467
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1345 Property Damage
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2022
Terminated:Apr 10, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2023 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Waterstone Place LLC
516 Stafford Springs Ave
Stafford, TX 77477
Represented By
Brandy Michelle Alexander
Alexander Law, PLLC
contact info
Notice Only
DeKarla Fuller
653 Summer Park Dr
Houston, TX 77477
Plaintiff
DeKarla Fuller
653 Summer Park Dr
Houston, TX 77477

GPO Mar 13 2023
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, 9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. Objections to M&R due by 3/27/2023(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
GPO Apr 10 2023
ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 19 Memorandum and Recommendations. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.