Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-14240

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 2:22-ap-01166
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2022
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 6:40 AM PDT
Defendant
ANDREW WATT
Defendant
MIOMNI HOLDING CO.
Represented By
MIOMNI HOLDING CO.
contact info
Defendant
MIOMNI GAMING LTD.
Represented By
MIOMNI GAMING LTD.
contact info
Defendant
MIOMNI SPORTS LTD.
Represented By
MIOMNI SPORTS LTD.
contact info
Defendant
MIOMNI LTD.
Represented By
MIOMNI LTD.
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL VENNER
Defendant
MIOMNI SPORTS LTD., A FOREIGN LIMITED-LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
Kung & Brown
contact info
Defendant
PHILLIP KONSTAM
Defendant
MIOMNI LTD., A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
Kung & Brown
contact info
Defendant
MIOMNI HOLDINGS LIMITED, A FOREIGN HOLDING COMPANY
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
Kung & Brown
contact info
Interested Party
LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER CHRISTIE LLP
3993 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY SUITE 600
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
KENNETH F. ROSSMAN
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
OGONNA M. BROWN
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie
contact info
Interested Party
TROY FOX
601 S TENTH ST Suite 202
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
TROY S. FOX
Fox, Imes And Crosby, LLC
contact info
Liquidator
Gavin Savage
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
Kung & Brown
contact info
Other Prof.
Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC
Represented By
LAWRENCE J SEMENZA, III
Semenza Rickard Law
contact info
Other Prof.
WYNN LAS VEGAS, LLC
3131 LAS VEGAS BLVD. SO
LAS VEGAS, NV 89109
Represented By
LAWRENCE J SEMENZA, III
Semenza Rickard Law
contact info
Plaintiff
SBC NEVADA, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE CLAIMS OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED
McDONALD CARANO LLP 2300 W. SAHARA AVE., SUITE 1200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89102
Represented By
RYAN J. WORKS
Mcdonald Carano Wilson LLP
contact info
PHILIP T. VARRICCHIO
Varricchio Law Firm
contact info
JOHN A FORTIN
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SBC NEVADA, LLC
McDONALD CARANO LLP 2300 W. SAHARA AVE., SUITE 1200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89102
Represented By
RYAN J. WORKS
Mcdonald Carano Wilson LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MIOMNI HOLDING LIMITED, A FOREIGN HOLDING COMPANY
Terminated: 02/05/2024
Represented By
A.J. KUNG
Kung & Brown
contact info
Interested Party
MIOMNI GAMING LTD., A FOREIGN LIMITED-LIABILITY COMPANY
Terminated: 02/16/2023
Represented By
MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW
Larson & Zirzow, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
436 436 adv_misc Supplement (Adv) Tue 12/10 5:10 PM
Supplement SBC Nevada LLC's Supplement Following the December 10, 2024 Hearing Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of SBC NEVADA, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE CLAIMS OF MIOMNI GAMING LIMITED (WORKS, RYAN)
Related: [-]