Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:22-cv-00494
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2022
Re-opened:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2023 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By
Susan Kendall Stradley
Morgan Lewis & Bockius, Llp - Houston
contact info
James Travis Underwood
Gillam & Smith LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Jason C White
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp - Chicago
contact info
Natalie A. Bennett
Morgan Lewis & Brockius Llp - D.C.
contact info
Collin W Park
Morgan Lewis & Brockius Llp - D.C.
contact info
Defendant
LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By
Susan Kendall Stradley
Morgan Lewis & Bockius, Llp - Houston
contact info
James Travis Underwood
Gillam & Smith LLP
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Jason C White
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp - Chicago
contact info
Natalie A. Bennett
Morgan Lewis & Brockius Llp - D.C.
contact info
Collin W Park
Morgan Lewis & Brockius Llp - D.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Multimedia Technologies Pte. Ltd.
Represented By
Gregory Springsted
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Christopher Gerson
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Ramya A Sundaram
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Robert Christopher Bunt
Parker Bunt & Ainsworth
contact info
John Paul Mixon
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
283 283 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/21 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Multimedia Technologies Pte. Ltd. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/17 2:08 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection followed by Trial Day 1 previously set for 4/21/2025 has been RESET for 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (aeb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
282 282 adr Report of Mediation Tue 04/15 7:43 PM
REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom Related [+]. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
Related: [-] t.