Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:22-cv-05483
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 25, 2023 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Joule Energy Holding, LLC
701 S. Alexander Street
New Orleans, LA 70119
Plaintiff
HCS Renewable Energy, LLC
Represented By
Beverly Ann Whitley
Bell Nunnally & Martin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 08/23 1:49 PM
ORDER DISMISSING as moot15 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff shall have and recover its attorneys' fees and expenses in the amount of $8,044.18. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/23/2023. (cs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
17 17 motion Attorney Fees Fri 05/05 6:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC.(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
16 16 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 05/05 9:51 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re15 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte.' (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
15 15 motion Attorney Fees Thu 05/04 3:24 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC.(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit B. Whitley,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
14 14 order Judgment - Default Wed 04/26 10:05 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of HCS Renewable Energy, LLC against Joule Energy Holding, LLC as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/25/2023.(js)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 04/25 9:51 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Joule Energy Holding, LLC. Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF. The Affidavit and Exhibits should have been filed as attachments to the Motion. All future filings should be entered this way. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/24 8:33 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to Joule Energy Holding, LLC by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC.(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 02/14 1:20 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Entry of Default as to Joule Energy Holding, LLC. Signed by Clerk. (ko)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 02/14 10:27 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk: Filing attorney should have selected "Yes" at the question "Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?" before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect "Exparte." (ko)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
9 9 motion Entry of Default Mon 02/13 2:49 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Joule Energy Holding, LLC d/b/a Joule Energy, LLC by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC.(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
8 8 misc Request Tue 02/07 3:09 PM
Request by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Order
Monday, January 30, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/30 12:35 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that, absent an appearance by defendant, plaintiff moves for entry of default on or before February 7, 2023, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why this defendant should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 1/30/2023.(mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/27 6:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Joule Energy Holding, LLC served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. (Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 01/03 3:39 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying corporate parent Workrise Technologies, Inc. for HCS Renewable Energy, LLC by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC (Whitley, Beverly) Modified text/added corporate parent on 1/3/2023 (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/28 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Joule Energy Holding, LLC. (mm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 12/28 8:20 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
2 2 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Tue 12/27 7:22 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/27 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9719862) filed by HCS Renewable Energy, LLC.Attorney Beverly Ann Whitley added to party HCS Renewable Energy, LLC(pty:pla).(Whitley, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet