Hawaii District Court
Judge:Jill A Otake
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:22-cv-00515
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2022
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 24, 2023 11:15 PM HST
Defendant
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Represented By
Sarah O. Wang
Marr Jones & Wang LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hilo Medical Center
Represented By
Sarah O. Wang
Marr Jones & Wang LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Illya Erwin
Represented By
Michael P. Healy
contact info
Charles H. Brower
Pioneer Plaza
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM HST
Thursday, January 11, 2024
27 27 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thu 01/11 11:56 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 1/11/2024. (jni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
26 26 minutes Settlement Conference Settlement on the Record 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/15 4:21 PM
EP: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT ON THE RECORD Illya Erwin, represented by Michael Healy, appeared for Plaintiff. Jordan Fickess, represented by Sarah Wang, appeared for Defendants. The Court held a Settlement Conference by video teleconference. (1:30 pm - 3:20 pm - not recorded/no record) Discussions held. Settlement reached. The Court held a Settlement on the Record. (3:25 pm - 3:31 pm - recorded) Counsel stated the confidential key terms on the record. The Court found that the parties have entered into a valid and enforceable settlement. Stipulation for Dismissal shall be submitted to otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov, copied to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov, no later than January 12, 2024. All dates and deadlines, including trial, are VACATED. (ZOOM / 1:30 pm - 3:20 pm (No Record) / 3:25 pm - 3:31 pm) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
25 25 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Wed 11/01 1:59 PM
EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, and by agreement of the parties, the Early Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 1:00 PM is CONTINUED to 1:30 PM, the same day (11/15/2023) , before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via Video Teleconference (VTC). As a reminder, the Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by November 8, 2023. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) Modified on 11/1/2023 (jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
24 24 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/16 3:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum, Exhibit 1 (Kaya, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/14 1:32 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/14/2023. (adi)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 08/14 10:36 AM
EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Mr. Michael Healy appeared for Plaintiff. Ms. Cecily Kaya appeared for Defendants. The Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Dates Given. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 11/18/2024 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 7/23/2024 at 1:00 PM by Video Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/21/2024. Discovery due by 6/21/2024. Other Matters: An Early Settlement Conference is set for November 15, 2023 at 1:00 PM by VTC before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. The Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by November 8, 2023. The parties are directed to consult Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter's Standing Order Regarding Settlement Conferences, available on the Court's public website, regarding the format of the confidential settlement conference statement and settlement conference procedures. Telephonic hearings before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter, will be held via Zoom Dial: 1-833-568-8864 / Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470 . Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake available on the court's website. (adi)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Mon 08/14 8:11 AM
EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 8/14/2023 at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to 10:00 AM, the same day (8/14/2023), before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
20 20 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/08 10:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center re Notice of Subpoenas Duces Tecum; Exhibits 1-4 (Wang, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
19 19 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Mon 08/07 6:47 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/25 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cecily D. M. Kaya on behalf of Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center on behalf of Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center. (Kaya, Cecily)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Tue 07/25 10:59 AM
EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 8/7/2023 to 8/14/2023 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
16 16 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/07 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center re Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Kaya, Cecily)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 06/07 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center re Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Kaya, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
14 14 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Tue 06/06 1:41 PM
EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 7/11/2023 to 8/7/2023 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
13 13 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/24 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center re Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Kaya, Cecily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/29 2:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's Answer to Complaint filed December 27, 2022 [Doc 1] by Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center.(Wang, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
11 11 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Mon 03/27 3:40 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Wang, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
10 10 misc Report of Planning Meeting Thu 03/16 9:57 AM
REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting . (Wang, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
minutes 2 - Set Hearings Mon 03/13 2:34 PM
EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 4/3/2023 to 7/11/2023 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(st)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/09 9:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illya Erwin. Hawaii Health Systems Corporation served on 3/8/2023. (Brower, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
minutes 2 - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/25 11:15 AM
EO: Because Defendants have not yet appeared in this action, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 2/21/2023 to 4/3/2023 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
minutes Link Wed 12/28 9:01 AM
EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
5 5 misc Civil Waiver of Service Packet Tue 12/27 12:19 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons,
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Tue 12/27 12:17 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/21/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/27/2022. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/27 12:15 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00515 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/27 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT ; Jury Demand against Illya Erwin Hawaii Health Systems Corporation, Hilo Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2778494.), filed by Illya Erwin.(Brower, Charles) Modified on 12/27/2022 (eta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Jury Demand,
Att: 2 (Proposed) Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/27 12:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) or 12.4(a) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 12/27 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00515 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta)
Related: [-]