Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 4:22-bk-42198
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jan 26, 2023

Debtor
Capitol Sales Company, Inc.
2408 Sherwood Hills Rd
Hopkins, MN 55305
Represented By
Chad A. Kelsch
Kelsch Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randall L. Seaver
Randall L. Seaver, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 1167
Burnsville, MN 55337
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 12/28/2022 12:02 AM CST
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Tue 12/27 1:15 PM
List of Creditors load 47 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee) Tue 12/27 1:09 PM
Chapter 7 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: Capitol Sales Company, Inc.. Proof of authority to sign and file petition (Local Form 1008-1). Receipt Number CC, Fee Amount $338.00 Incomplete Filings due by 01/10/2023. (Kelsch, Chad)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys Tue 12/27 1:10 PM
Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys filed by Capitol Sales Company, Inc. and Chad A. Kelsch. (Kelsch, Chad)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc MNB Signature declaration Tue 12/27 1:10 PM
Signature declaration filed by Capitol Sales Company, Inc.. (Kelsch, Chad)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc MNB Proof of authority to sign and file petition Tue 12/27 1:22 PM
Proof of authority to sign and file petition filed by Capitol Sales Company, Inc.. (Kelsch, Chad)
Related: [-]
5 5 court MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Tue 12/27 3:14 PM
Meeting of Creditors. Trustee Randall L. Seaver assigned to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/26/2023 at 09:30 AM at ***VIDEO/TELECONFERENCE ONLY***. (Sherri MNBD)
Related: [-]
6 6 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Tue 12/27 5:01 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00 by CN. Receipt Number 211147. (admin)
Related: [-]