Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Ross
Case #: 4:22-cv-01382
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2022
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 25, 2023 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Brick by Brick Farms LLC
Represented By
Helen Farnan Carpenter
Jenkins And Kling PC
contact info
Roger W. Pecha
Jenkins And Kling PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Kirchner
Represented By
Douglas Schapiro
Schapiro Law Group Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 23, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 10/23 2:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint - with Prejudice by Plaintiff Gary Kirchner.(Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 10/23 5:04 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:14 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint - with Prejudice by Plaintiff Gary Kirchner. (Schapiro, Douglas); SO ORDERED. Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 10/23/23. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 08/30 4:29 PM
ORDER: Having been advised that a settlement has been achieved between Plaintiff and Defendant [ECF No. 12], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all case deadlines are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 10/29/2023.) Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 8/30/23. (JAB)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 08/30 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Gary Kirchner (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/03 3:25 PM
NOTICE Unavailability: by Plaintiff Gary Kirchner (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
10 10 order Case Management Order Mon 03/13 4:25 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (Motion to Join Parties due by 5/27/2023. Discovery Completion due by 11/29/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2023. Bench Trial set for 4/15/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/13/2023. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Mon 03/13 3:20 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Gary Kirchner. . (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
8 8 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Tue 03/07 2:30 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Brick by Brick Farms LLC, Joseph Staat, Daniel Staat, James Staat.. (Pecha, Roger)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
7 7 order Rule 16 Order Wed 03/01 12:14 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel in this matter shall be familiar with the Court's Local Rules and shall read the Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF), and the undersigned's Requirements and Federal Practice Tips at www.moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: No later than March 14, 2023, counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court a joint proposed scheduling plan. This case is assigned to Track: 2. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/14/2023.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/1/2023. (CLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 02/28 6:47 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Helen Farnan Carpenter for Defendant Brick by Brick Farms LLC. (Carpenter, Helen)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 02/28 6:42 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Roger W. Pecha for Defendant Brick by Brick Farms LLC. (Pecha, Roger)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/28 6:38 PM
Brick by Brick Farms LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Brick by Brick Farms LLC.(Pecha, Roger)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/09 7:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gary Kirchner. Brick by Brick Farms LLC served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 12/28 9:35 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Douglas Schapiro. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JDC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Tue 12/27 6:45 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gary Kirchner Process Server: Pam King Wheetley (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/27 6:42 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Brick by Brick Farms LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-9691721, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gary Kirchner.(Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt - Lemonaid,
Att: 2 Exhibit Selfie - Lemonaid,
Att: 3 Exhibit Receipt - Exclusive Smoke & Vape,
Att: 4 Exhibit Selfie - Exclusive Smoke & Vape,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Original Filing Form