California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:22-cv-07876
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2022
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 07, 2023 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Goldcast Inc.
Represented By
Leo Benjamin Kittay
Fross Zelnick Lehrman Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Mark R. Conrad
Conrad | Metlitzky | Kane LLP
contact info
Richard Z. Lehv
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kishore Kothandaraman
Represented By
Leo Benjamin Kittay
Fross Zelnick Lehrman Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Mark R. Conrad
Conrad | Metlitzky | Kane LLP
contact info
Richard Z. Lehv
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ON24, Inc.
Represented By
Aislinn Smalling
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Oscar M. Orozco-Botello
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Gina Louise Durham
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info

GPO Dec 28 2022
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond To the Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2022)
GPO Feb 10 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Leo Kittay. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
GPO Feb 22 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Richard Lehv. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
GPO Mar 15 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023)
GPO Jun 06 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation Extending Mediation Completion Date. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2023)
GPO Jul 17 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 43 Stipulation EXTENDING DATES FOR CLOSE OF DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
GPO Sep 20 2023
ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATION Of Dismissal with Prejudice DISMISSING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2023)

Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
50 50 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/20 3:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATION Of Dismissal with Prejudice DISMISSING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 09/20 2:04 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by ON24, Inc.. (Durham, Gina)
Related: [-]