New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:22-cv-07564
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Re-opened:Jul 27, 2023
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 4:47 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
KENT PLACE SCHOOL
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Hatfield Schwartz Law Group LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
ROBERTA MORAN
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Hatfield Schwartz Law Group LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
AMANDA YANNOTTA
Represented By
BRIAN GREGORY KLEIN
Weinstein & Klein P.C.
contact info
LAURA MARIA GARCIA
Weinstein & Klein P.C.
contact info
RANDI COHEN
Kalmanson Cohen, PLLC
contact info
DAMIEN H. WEINSTEIN
Weinstein & Klein PC
contact info
Defendant
KENT PLACE SCHOOL
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Hatfield Schwartz Law Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
ROBERTA MORAN
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Hatfield Schwartz Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
AMANDA YANNOTTA
Represented By
BRIAN GREGORY KLEIN
Weinstein & Klein P.C.
contact info
LAURA MARIA GARCIA
Weinstein & Klein P.C.
contact info
RANDI COHEN
Kalmanson Cohen, PLLC
contact info
DAMIEN H. WEINSTEIN
Weinstein & Klein PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 27, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 07/28 8:08 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen the case and make a new and separate docket entry reading CIVIL CASE REOPENED and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/27/2023. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 05/18 10:25 AM
ORDER Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/17/2023. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/18/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/23 2:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Settlement Conference held on 5/17/2023. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
20 20 17 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/27 4:05 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/20 4:12 PM
LETTER ORDER re17 Staying Discovery and Administratively Terminating16 MOTION to Dismiss, and will be reinstated in the event the settlement conference is unsuccessful. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/20/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2023 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2A; The parties shall submit separate confidential ex parte settlement position papers not to exceed five (5) pages, by no later than 5/15/2023. Such letters are not to be filed, but are to be sent directly to Chambers via email. Formal discovery shall be stayed pending the conference, but the parties are encouraged to continue with the informal exchange of documents and items that may be in aid of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/15/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 03/15 4:23 PM
Letter. (SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 03/21 8:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 3/15/2023. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/14 9:46 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kent's Counterclaims. Motion set for 4/17/2023 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
16 16 2 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 03/13 5:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kent's Counterclaims by AMANDA YANNOTTA. Responses due by 4/3/2023.(KLEIN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 3 1 pgs Certificate of Service
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/13 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN GREGORY KLEIN on behalf of AMANDA YANNOTTA (KLEIN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Mon 03/13 10:30 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The14 6.1 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Answer filed by STEFANI SCHWARTZ on 3/10/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion for an extension of time to file Answer. This message is for informational purposes only; for future reference please submit the 6.1 Application using the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order", which can be found under Civil, Other filings, Other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/13 11:06 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The14 Clerk's Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise respond submitted by ROBERTA MORAN, KENT PLACE SCHOOL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/27/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/10 12:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 03/08 10:19 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by AMANDA YANNOTTA.(GARCIA, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/27 9:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KENT PLACE SCHOOL, ROBERTA MORAN, filed by AMANDA YANNOTTA.(GARCIA, LAURA)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 02/27 1:08 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMANDA YANNOTTA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/13/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 02/23 6:35 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Counterclaims.. (GARCIA, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 02/07 9:08 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/7/2023. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/06 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENT PLACE SCHOOL. (SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
8 8 14 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/06 3:57 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First COUNTERCLAIM against AMANDA YANNOTTA by ROBERTA MORAN, KENT PLACE SCHOOL.(SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/31 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA MARIA GARCIA on behalf of AMANDA YANNOTTA (GARCIA, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/30 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RANDI COHEN on behalf of AMANDA YANNOTTA (COHEN, RANDI)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
qc QC - Updating Account Fri 01/27 11:02 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE submitted by RANDI COHEN on 1/26/2023 appears to have the case number and address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/26 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RANDI COHEN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (COHEN, RANDI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 01/24 9:55 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ROBERTA MORAN, KENT PLACE SCHOOL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/7/2023. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 01/23 10:57 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants' Answer.. (SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/23 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ on behalf of All Defendants (SCHWARTZ, STEFANI)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/30 9:56 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KENT PLACE SCHOOL and ROBERTA MORAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/29 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against KENT PLACE SCHOOL, ROBERTA MORAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13925192) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMANDA YANNOTTA.(WEINSTEIN, DAMIEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/29 4:33 PM
Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
Related: [-]