California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:22-cv-02066
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause12:1441 FHLB: Financial Inst Reform Receiving Enforcement Act 1989
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02022-00042856-CU-OE-CTL
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 2:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Centerra Group, LLC
Represented By
Raina Sharma
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Suzana I. Sinatra
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Constellis
Defendant
Does 2 through 50
Plaintiff
Antonio Johnson
Represented By
Pamela Vallero
Gruenberg Law
contact info
Christopher Joseph Hoodecheck
Gruenberg Law
contact info
Joshua D Gruenberg
Law Office Of Joshua D. Gruenberg
contact info

GPO Jan 08 2024
ORDER Granting 14 in Part Joint Motion to Continue the Discovery Cutoff and Related Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 1/8/2024. (exs)
GPO Mar 22 2024
U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant Centerra Group LLC's Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME [Doc. No. 19]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 03/22/2024. (All non-registered users served via

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 08, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/08 11:08 AM
ORDER Granting33 Joint Motion to Dismiss Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/8/2024. (exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
34 34 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 11/07 2:04 PM
Minute Order Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss. Doc. No.33 . Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the SDC set for November 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on November 7, 2024. (no document attached) (wjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
33 33 motion Dismiss Wed 11/06 7:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Antonio Johnson. (Vallero, Pamela)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/06 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Jointly Filed) by Antonio Johnson (Gruenberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
31 31 minutes Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/07 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres and Minute Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The Court held an SDC on October 7, 2024. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. Defense counsel represented that the parties will likely seek dismissal within 30 days. Accordingly, the Court hereby SETS a telephonic SDC for November 8, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Further, the Court reminds Plaintiff's counsel that conferences and hearings are not discretionary, and any future failure to appear may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on October 7, 2024. (Defendant Attorney Raina Sharma) (no document attached) (wjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
30 30 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 10/04 1:57 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Centerra Group, LLC. AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT .(Conrad, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, August 19, 2024
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 08/19 11:39 AM
Minute Order Vacating Case Deadlines and Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of the parties' Notice of Settlement (Doc. No.28 ), the Court hereby VACATES all remaining hearings and deadlines in this case and SETS a telephonic SDC for October 7, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 19, 2024.(no document attached) (wjb)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 08/19 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Centerra Group, LLC (Sharma, Raina) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 06/07 10:00 AM
ORDER Granting26 Joint Ex Parte Application for an Order to Modify the Expert Exchange Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 6/7/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/31 1:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Notice and Ex Parte Application for an Order to Modify the Expert Exchange Deadline by Centerra Group, LLC.(Sharma, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Raina Sharma iso Joint Notice and Ex Parte Application for Order to Modify the Expert Exchange Deadline,
Att: 2 Declaration of Marc Cohen iso Joint Notice and Ex Parte Application for Order to Modify the Expert Exchange Deadline,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Joint Notice and Ex Parte Application for an Order to Modify the Expert Exchange Deadline
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Susan I. Sinatra by Centerra Group, LLC (Conrad, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Paul F. Sorrentino by Centerra Group, LLC (Conrad, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Leah Conrad on behalf of Centerra Group, LLC (Conrad, Adrienne)Attorney Adrienne Leah Conrad added to party Centerra Group, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Joint Discovery Plan Mon 05/13 10:30 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Centerra Group, LLC STIPULATION re Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff (Sharma, Raina)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/22 10:47 AM
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant Centerra Group LLC's Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME [Doc. No.19 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 03/22/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
20 20 misc Declaration Tue 03/19 4:47 PM
DECLARATION re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Ex Parte Application Extending Time for IME) by Defendant Centerra Group, LLC.(Sharma, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dr. R. Scott Johnson Defendant Centerra Group LLCs Notice And Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/19 4:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Ex Parte Application Extending Time for IME) by Centerra Group, LLC.(Sharma, Raina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Raina Sharma iso Notice and Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME,
Att: 2 Declaration of Odette Jefferson iso Notice and Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Centerra Group LLCs Notice and Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time for IME
Thursday, March 14, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 03/14 11:25 PM
Order Granting Motion Re Independent Mental Examination (Doc. No.17 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on March 14, 2024.(wjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 motion Discovery Thu 02/29 12:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Stipulation Re: Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff by Antonio Johnson. (Wasiluk, Samantha)Attorney Samantha Nicole Wasiluk added to party Antonio Johnson(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Sorrentino on behalf of Centerra Group, LLC (Sorrentino, Paul)Attorney Paul F. Sorrentino added to party Centerra Group, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
15 15 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 01/08 10:05 AM
ORDER Granting14 in Part Joint Motion to Continue the Discovery Cutoff and Related Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 1/8/2024. (exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
14 14 motion Continue Thu 12/28 2:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue the Discovery Cutoff and Related Dates by Centerra Group, LLC. (Sinatra, Suzana)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
13 13 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 12/12 12:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 22-cv-02066-W-VET.(no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniella Doern on behalf of Antonio Johnson (Doern, Daniella)Attorney Daniella Doern added to party Antonio Johnson(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catharine McGlynn on behalf of Antonio Johnson (McGlynn, Catharine)Attorney Catharine McGlynn added to party Antonio Johnson(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
10 10 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 08/18 11:51 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Entry Of Stipulated Protective Order As Modified [ECF No.9 ]; Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/18/2023. (ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
9 9 motion Protective Order Wed 08/16 2:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Centerra Group, LLC. (Sinatra, Suzana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/05 1:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-trial Proceedings: Discovery due by 5/3/2024., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2024., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan., Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 8/19/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/5/2023.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
7 7 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Wed 06/28 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 6/28/2023. (Plaintiff Attorneys Joshua D. Gruenberg, Christopher Hoodecheck). (Defendant Attorney Suzana I. Sinatra). (Other Participants Antonio Johnson (Plaintiff), Christine BienAime (Defendant representative)). Case did not settle. Court to issue scheduling order. (no document attached) (cdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
6 6 notice Joint Discovery Plan Wed 06/07 3:02 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Constellis re5 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (Sinatra, Suzana)Attorney Suzana I. Sinatra added to party Constellis(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
5 5 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 04/06 10:09 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/28/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/6/2023.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/05 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Hoodecheck on behalf of Antonio Johnson (Hoodecheck, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Joseph Hoodecheck added to party Antonio Johnson(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/30 4:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centerra Group, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties.(Sinatra, Suzana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Def.'s Disclosure Statement
Thursday, December 29, 2022
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 12/29 1:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Centerra Group, LLC. (maq)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 12/29 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego-Central Division, case number 37-2022 00042856-CU-OE-CTL (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-17457467.), filed by Centerra Group, LLC. The new case number is 3:22-cv-2066-W-BGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(maq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 55 pgs Declaration Suzana Sinatra,
Att: 3 Declaration Raymond Gellatly,
Att: 4 Request for Judicial Notice by Centerra Group, LLC,
Att: 5 Proof of Service of Removal Documents