Christina Kimm v. Galbi Brothers, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-09434 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Galbi Brothers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Christina Kimm
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 01/03 10:16 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii), IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk is directed to close the file. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 01/02 5:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Christina Kimm.(Yi, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissal | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 01/02 9:00 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT set on Thursday, January 4, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 11/21 2:15 PM
IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Senior District Judge George H Wu: On November 21, 2023, Plaintiff Christina Kimm filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 30 days. The Court nowsets an order to show re: settlement hearing for January 4, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on January 2, 2024. (shb) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Settlement
Tue 11/21 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Christina Kimm. (Yi, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 11/21 1:04 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Senior District Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the post mediation status conference set on Monday, November 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/26 3:14 PM
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel for Defendant is not present. Court and confers with Plaintiff's counsel. For reasons stated on the record, the post mediation status conference is continued to November 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed by noon on November 22, 2023. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/24 2:58 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for the post mediation status conference set on Thursday, October 26, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/13 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Joint Rule 26(f) Repo1i (Docket No. 15) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 17, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 04/11 3:47 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Declaration of Michael H. Yi with Exhibit "A" ; estimated length of trial 4 - 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Christina Kimm.. (Yi, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 03/08 1:15 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 17, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 10, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 03/08 9:04 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/07 7:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Galbi Brothers, Inc..(Attorney Yohan Lee added to party Galbi Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Yohan) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/03 1:17 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/03 8:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Galbi Brothers, Inc. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 12/29 4:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Christina Kimm. (Yi, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 12/29 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 12/29 4:34 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 12/29 4:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 12/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 12/29 2:36 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties (Yi, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Thu 12/29 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Christina Kimm. (Yi, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 12/29 2:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christina Kimm. (Yi, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 12/29 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34544760 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Michael Han Yi added to party Christina Kimm(pty:pla))(Yi, Michael) |