Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:22-cv-01387
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Case in other court:207th Judicial District Hays County, 22-02754
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Target Corporation
Germer Beaman Brown 1501 S. MoPac Expy Suite A400
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
George Robert Sonnier
Germer Beaman & Brown PLLC
contact info
Samantha Courtney Jeffers
Germer, Beaman & Brown, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher L. Rhodes
Deas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Bobbi Montgomery
Represented By
Joshua P. Harrison
Bergquist Law Firm
contact info
David W. Bergquist
Bergquist Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/17 8:41 AM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/12 4:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Target Corporation.(Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Final Judgment
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
33 33 notice Notice Wed 11/15 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Expert Designations by Target Corporation (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
32 32 adr ADR Report - Other Tue 10/31 2:28 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Target Corporation(Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/11 10:59 AM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATEGatekeeper Systems, Inc. as a party in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 27, 2023
30 30 motion Dismiss Sun 08/27 3:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Claims against Defendant Gatekeeper Systems, Inc. by Bobbi Montgomery.(Bergquist, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
29 29 notice Notice Wed 06/28 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SCHEDULING ORDER by Target Corporation (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 06/28 4:44 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc. . (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
order Order on Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Thu 06/15 1:27 PM
Text Order MOOTING16 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the scheduling order entered in this case, (Dkt. 24), this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
27 27 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/09 4:07 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.. (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 06/09 3:40 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 25 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge (jv2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
25 25 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Thu 06/08 7:08 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.. (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
24 24 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/05 3:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due on or before 5/1/2023, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/15/2024 09:00 AM in Austin before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due on or before 10/31/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2023, Discovery due by 10/13/2023, Motions on or before 10/20/2023. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
23 23 minutes Pretrial Conference Mon 06/05 3:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Initial Pretrial Conference held Telephone and In Person on 6/2/2023. Written Order Forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically) (Court Reporter Lily I. Reznik.)(pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
22 22 misc Advisory to the Court Tue 05/09 11:47 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc. Attorney's vacation letter . (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/04 2:29 PM
ORDER RESETTING Initial Pretrial Conference and BY TELEPHONE ( Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
20 20 minutes Pretrial Conference Thu 04/20 1:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Initial Pretrial Conference held by Telephone on 4/20/2023. Written Order Forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
19 19 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 04/18 8:19 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
18 18 motion Protective Order Mon 04/17 10:48 AM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality/Protective Order by Target Corporation.(Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/21 12:42 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 4/20/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
16 16 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Mon 03/20 1:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Target Corporation.(Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 03/20 1:41 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Target Corporation. (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 03/08 8:47 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 3/22/2023. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/07 8:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua P. Harrison for Bobbi Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/03 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David W. Bergquist on behalf of Bobbi Montgomery. Attorney David W. Bergquist added to party Bobbi Montgomery(pty:pla) (Bergquist, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/27 3:34 PM
Proposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David W. Bergquist ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17020349) by on behalf of Bobbi Montgomery.(Bergquist, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 01/25 2:03 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.. (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
9 9 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 01/20 1:53 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Gatekeeper Systems, Inc. Attorney's vacation letter . (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
8 8 misc Response Mon 01/09 2:19 PM
RESPONSE to4 Order, by Target Corporation. (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Fri 01/06 3:56 PM
NOTICE Defendant's Consent to Removal by Gatekeeper, Inc (Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/06 1:45 PM
Gatekeeper Systems, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Christopher L. Rhodes added to party Gatekeeper, Inc (pty:dft) by Gatekeeper, Inc.(Rhodes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Thu 01/05 8:43 AM
Order Directing Joshua P. Harrison to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/03 2:36 PM
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(b), that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings.. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 12/29 5:37 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Thu 12/29 5:31 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/29 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-16907818), filed by Target Corporation.(Sonnier, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement JS44,
Att: 3 20 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/03 11:07 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 01/03 11:10 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn)
Related: [-]