California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:22-bk-03283
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jan 24, 2023
Claims Deadline:Apr 25, 2023

Debtor
Spa Girl Cocktails Inc.
7424 Trade St
San Diego, CA 92121-2410
Represented By
Vincent Renda
Pinnacle Legal P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Leslie T. Gladstone
5656 La Jolla Blvd.,
La Jolla, CA 92037
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 01/29/2023 9:55 PM PST
Thursday, December 29, 2022
1 1 49 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external Thu 12/29 9:12 AM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 338.00. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2023, Filed by Vincent Renda of Pinnacle Legal P.C. on behalf of Spa Girl Cocktails Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nda, Vincent
2 2 crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Thu 12/29 9:17 AM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 22-03283 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 338.00 Receipt number A17545702 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801) Thu 12/29 9:18 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Vincent Renda on behalf of Spa Girl Cocktails Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petitionnda, Vincent
4 4 CASBApi CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS) Thu 12/29 9:19 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Gladstone, Leslie T. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/24/2023 at 09:30 AM at To access the Zoom 341 meeting, go to Zoom.us and click Join Meeting, or call 1 669 900 6833, (lg) and enter Meeting ID Number 737 172 7291 and Passcode 464908 when prompted.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nda, Vincent
5 5 BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors
6 6 BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Additional Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Information Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors