Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:22-cv-01466
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2022
Terminated:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2023 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association
606 N. Washington Street
Alexandria, VA 22314
Represented By
Jeremy Daniel Camacho
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk
Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP
contact info
Brian Adam Scotti
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Mary Elizabeth Davis
Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James Reeves
Represented By
Elizabeth Velander
Mcclanahan Powers PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
17 17 order So Ordered Tue 08/29 8:22 AM
So Ordered in re16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by James Reeves. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/29/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/28 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Reeves (McClanahan, Dirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/14 1:52 PM
ORDERED that final pretrial conference in this matter be, and the same hereby is CANCELED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/14/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/14 9:15 AM
Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/17/2023 at 03:00 PM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
Related: [-]
utility 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/14 1:53 PM
***Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/17/2023 at 03:00 PM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga - CANCELED. See Dkt.15 . (tran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
14 14 5 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Wed 04/19 1:04 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 4/19/2023. (nneb)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 04/19 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2023 by telephone. Appearance of counsel for plaintiff and defendant. Discovery Plan approved. Order to issue. (nneb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
12 12 misc Discovery Plan Tue 04/11 4:00 PM
Proposed Rule 26(f) Joint Discovery Plan by National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association.(Scotti, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 04/11 11:06 AM
ORDERED that NARFE's Motion for Substitution of Counsel is granted; it is further ORDERED that Brian A. Scotti, Esq. and Jeremy D. Camacho, Esq., and the law firm of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP are hereby substituted in the place of Mary Elizabeth Davis, Esq. and Peter N.Y. Zuk, Esq., and the law firm of Whiteford, Taylor & Preston, LLP as counsel for NARFE in this matter; it is further ORDERED that Mary Elizabeth Davis, Esq. and Peter N.Y. Zuk, Esq., and the law firm of Whiteford, Taylor & Preston, LLP are granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record from this matter. The withdrawal and substitution of counsel will not alter any deadlines existing in this case.8 Motion to Substitute Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 4/11/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/11 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Daniel Camacho on behalf of National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association (Camacho, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/11 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Adam Scotti on behalf of National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association (Scotti, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
8 8 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 04/10 2:47 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association.(Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/23 9:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Discovery due by 8/11/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/23/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 03/22 3:24 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association. (Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/22 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association.(Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/22 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Davis on behalf of National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association (Davis, Mary)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/22 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk on behalf of National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association (Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 12/30 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to National Active and Retired Federal Employees Association, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/30 11:40 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8731579.), filed by James Reeves.(Velander, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 12/30 3:37 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (swil)
Related: [-]