Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:22-cv-25411
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2023 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN JOSEPH SCHUSTER
Represented By
PEYTON PATRICK MURPHY
Murphy Law Firm Llc - Baton Rouge La
contact info
TODD C COMEAUX
Comeaux Law Firm - Baton Rouge La
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 10:39 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/15 7:17 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by BENJAMIN JOSEPH SCHUSTER. (MURPHY, PEYTON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Tue 03/14 9:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BENJAMIN JOSEPH SCHUSTER. (MURPHY, PEYTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/14 11:08 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel, See Local Rule 15.1(B) Separately Docketing a Motion for Leave and the Amended Pleading. File the proposed amended complaint as a separate entry. Re6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by BENJAMIN JOSEPH SCHUSTER (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/14 11:09 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/28/2023) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
5 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTE TO FILER For future reference Be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation unless the punctuation is part of the name. Also, When entering party names please add the full name as it is on the Complaint, (middle name, middle initials, generation). There is a field for each. Clerk will add to party name. Clerk will correct party name. (djb) Modified on 12/30/2022 to add to annotation regarding middle name (djb).
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/30 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TODD C COMEAUX on behalf of Benjamin Schuster (COMEAUX, TODD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/30 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PEYTON PATRICK MURPHY on behalf of Benjamin Schuster (MURPHY, PEYTON)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 12/30 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Northern District of Illinois by Benjamin Schuster (MURPHY, PEYTON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/30 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7620848.), filed by Benjamin Schuster. (MURPHY, PEYTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Fri 12/30 2:50 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTE TO FILER For future reference Be advised that all party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation unless the punctuation is part of the name. Also, When entering party names please add the full name as it is on the Complaint, (middle name, middle initials, generation). There is a field for each. Clerk will add to party name. Clerk will correct party name. (djb) Modified on 12/30/2022 to add to annotation regarding middle name (djb)
Related: [-]