New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 1:22-cv-10987
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2023 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Jerry O. Talton, III
Represented By
John F. O. McAllister
Mcallister Olivarius
contact info
Plaintiff
eShares, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew J. Levander
Dechert Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicolle Lipper Jacoby
Dechert Llp (nyc)
contact info
Samantha DeRuvo
Dechert Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christopher J. Merken
Dechert LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
166 166 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 05/07 5:45 PM
ORDER granting164 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery deadline is extended to September 24, 2025. Parties shall submit a post-discovery status letter by October 1, 2025. The case management conference scheduled for July 24, 2025 is ADJOURNED to October 8, 2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 5/7/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/07 5:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 9/24/2025. Set/Reset Hearings:( Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke.) (ar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
165 165 misc Letter Thu 05/01 5:13 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Matthew F. Paluch dated 05/01/2025 re: Revised Redacted Filings. Document filed by Jerry O. Talton, III..(Paluch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
164 164 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/01 1:45 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Nicolle L. Jacoby dated May 1, 2025. Document filed by Henry Ward, eShares, Inc...(Jacoby, Nicolle)
Related: [-]
163 163 misc Letter Thu 05/01 1:34 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Nicolle L. Jacoby dated May 1, 2025 re: Revised Redacted Filings. Document filed by Henry Ward, eShares, Inc...(Jacoby, Nicolle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G