District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:22-cv-03852
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2022
Re-opened:Jun 21, 2023
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2023 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lindsay M. Vick
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lindsay M. Vick
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
ALISSA EMMEL
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lindsay M. Vick
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lindsay M. Vick
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OLEG KOKAREV
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SALONEE VERMA
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ASKAR AITELIYEV
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SNEHA RAWAL
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MRIDHUL PRAKASH
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AKRAM BORIS KHREIS
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DEEPAK HEMRAJANI
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PRAKASH GOPINADHAM
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RASHMI CHAUDHARY
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI
Terminated: 06/21/2023
Represented By
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall file a renewed motion to dismiss the remaining claim by April 12, 2024. See full Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/12/2024. (lccrc1)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 26, 2024
order .Order Fri 04/26 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the23 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/26/2024. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/24 5:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/12 12:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall have through April 29, 2024 to file their renewed motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/12/2024. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 04/10 6:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion to Dismiss by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
21 21 31 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/12 5:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall file a renewed motion to dismiss the remaining claim by April 12, 2024. See full Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/12/2024. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/12 5:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' time to file its response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended nunc pro tunc to July 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/12/2024. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Thu 02/01 10:06 PM
STATUS REPORT Defendants' Response to Status Report by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 01/05 3:14 PM
Second STATUS REPORT by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN. (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/29 6:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/29 6:29 PM
NOTICE Plaintiffs' Status Update by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Wed 11/29 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re MRIDHUL PRAKASH (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 10, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Sun 09/10 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 08/29 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALISSA L. EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
13 13 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 08/02 12:52 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by ALISSA EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 22, 2023
12 12 misc Errata Sat 07/22 1:51 PM
ERRATA Response to Motion to Dismiss, corrected tables by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN re11 Response to motion,,.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Thursday, July 20, 2023
11 11 respm Response to motion Thu 07/20 12:04 AM
RESPONSE re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/11 9:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss by July 19, 2023. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by August 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/11/2023. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/10 12:16 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by ASKAR AITELIYEV, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, SNEHA RAWAL, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, SALONEE VERMA, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN. (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 06/20 11:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by ALISSA EMMEL, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Tue 06/20 8:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Srinivasa Sai Teza Mukkavilli (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/28 10:46 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint,, by ALISSA EMMEL, UR JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/28 6:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'7 Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to the First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint by June 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/28/2023. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/09 2:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALISSA EMMEL, UR JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, ASKAR AITELIYEV, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, SNEHA RAWAL, SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, SALONEE VERMA, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS, OLEG KOKAREV.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Vick on behalf of ALISSA EMMEL, UR JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Vick, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/20 7:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Molina, Ernesto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 01/03 11:19 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/03 11:05 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 12/30 10:06 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-892. (Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Fri 12/30 10:04 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against ALISSA EMMEL, UR JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760382) filed by GERALDINE PONCE VILLEGAS, RASHMI CHAUDHARY, FARIDA BHANU NOORBASH, HENRIQUE CORDEIRO TRECENTI, TATIANA LAFER CHAVES BRESCIANI, ASKAR AITELIYEV, TEDDY KEVIN TRUCHOT, ALEXIS EDGAR STAVRINOU, SNEHA RAWAL, SRINVASA SAI TEZA MUKKAVILLI, PRAKASH GOPINADHAM, ALISHA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, MRIDHUL PRAKASH, JEREMY THOMAS WIEDMAN, VENKATA HANUMANTHA RAO SRIRAM, MUHAMMAD ASIF SEEMAB, PARTH MAHESHBHAI PATEL, DEEPAK HEMRAJANI, SALONEE VERMA, UROOSA RIYAZ PEERMOHAMED, AKRAM BORIS KHREIS.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 USDA Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 ARC Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Investor timeline chart,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons Mayorkas,
Att: 6 Summons Jaddou,
Att: 7 Summons Emmel,
Att: 8 Summons USCIS,
Att: 9 Summons Attorney General,
Att: 10 Summons Civil Process Clerk,
Att: 11 Summons Rider to Summonses