New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Referred: Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:22-cv-10959
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2022
Re-opened:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Boston Children's Hospital
Represented By
Dov Kesselman
Seyfarth Shaw Llp (nyc)
contact info
Kyle Donald Winnick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marine Biological Laboratory
Represented By
Scott Warner
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Jason Michael Husgen
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By
Jennifer Chunias
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Marco Yu-Hin Wong
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Emily Unger
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rockefeller University
Represented By
Noa Michelle Baddish
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
Elise Michelle Bloom
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
The President and Fellows of Harvard College
Represented By
Andrew William Schilling
Schilling Law LLC
contact info
Gregory A. Manousos
Morgan, Brown & Joy, LLP
contact info
Cassandra Santoro Fuller
Morgan, Brown & Joy, LLP
contact info
Defendant
University of Chicago
Represented By
Scott Warner
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Jason Michael Husgen
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Science Foundation(NSF) - Center for Brains, Minds & Machines Cooperative Agreement
Defendant
President and Fellows of Harvard College
Plaintiff
Dr. Karolina Maria Maciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra
500 E 63rd Street Apt. 13F
New York, NY 10065
Plaintiff
Mr. Pedro Henrique Maciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra
500 E. 63rd Street Apt. 13F
New York, NY 10065
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Center for Brain, Minds and Machines at Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Terminated: 04/10/2023
Defendant
Harvard University
Terminated: 04/10/2023
Represented By
Andrew William Schilling
Schilling Law LLC
contact info
Cassandra Santoro Fuller
Morgan, Brown & Joy, LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Science Foundation (NSF)
Terminated: 04/10/2023
Represented By
Rebecca Lynn Salk
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
147 147 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Frederico Azevedo waiver sent on 3/25/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. Document filed by Karolina Maria Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra..(Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra, Karolina)
Related: [-]
146 146 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 2:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Winrich Freiwald waiver sent on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. Document filed by Karolina Maria Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra..(Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra, Karolina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
145 145 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/25 3:33 PM
ORDER granting144 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/25/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
144 144 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/25 10:24 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report Regarding the Retention of Counsel addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Karolina Agra dated 03/25/2025. Document filed by Karolina Maria Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra..(Marciniak-Domingues Goncalves Agra, Karolina)
Related: [-]