PERE v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00003 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 01, 2023 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
RICKY PERE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by RICKY PERE. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by RICKY PERE. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/07 2:29 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Amend (1) Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/21/2023) . (djb) |
||
Monday, January 02, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7621259.), filed by RICKY PERE. (KROTTINGER, KATHARINE) |