Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Melinda Harmon
Case #: 4:14-cv-02782
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2014
Terminated:Mar 10, 2015
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 3:34 PM CDT
Amicus
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
5410 Fredericksburg Road, Suite 200
San Antonio, TX 78229
Represented By
Edward Juarez
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Sheryl M Golkow
Us Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Amicus
National Center for Lesbian Rights
870 Market Street Suite 370
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Christopher Len Nichols
Randle Law Office Ltd LLP
contact info
Amicus
UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
United States Attorney's Office 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2300
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Keith Edward Wyatt
Office Of U S Attorney
contact info
Conflict Check Party
Hudson's Bay Company
Conflict Check Party
Saks Incorporated
Defendant
Saks & Company
Represented By
Michael D. Mitchell
Ogletree Deakins Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Leyth O. Jamal
Represented By
Jillian T Weiss
Office Of Jillian T. Weiss
contact info
Mitchell Katine
Katine & Nechman, LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/19/2015 12:49 AM CST
Tuesday, September 30, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against Saks & Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13783266) filed by Leyth O. Jamal.(Katine, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Agreed MOTION for Jillian T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leyth O. Jamal, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2014. (Katine, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Saks & Company, filed.(Katine, Mitchell)
Related: [-]