California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 4:23-cv-00004
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2023 3:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Victoria E. Brieant
an individual 4000 Ponce de Leon Blvd. Suite 470
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Victoria E. Brieant
Law Office Of Victoria E. Brieant
contact info
Defendant
Groupe Pelm International Corporation
Represented By
Victoria E. Brieant
Law Office Of Victoria E. Brieant
contact info
Defendant
Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A.
a Florida corporation 4000 Ponce de Leon Blvd Suite 470
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Victoria E. Brieant
Law Office Of Victoria E. Brieant
contact info
Defendant
Christian Pellegrini
Plaintiff
ABN Corporation
Represented By
Aaron Michael McKown
Mckown Bailey
contact info
Jimmie Lett Williams, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jimmie L. Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
RS Medical Supply, LLC
Represented By
Aaron Michael McKown
Mckown Bailey
contact info
Jimmie Lett Williams, Jr.
Law Offices Of Jimmie L. Williams
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 03/14 8:32 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
22 22 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/13 3:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Groupe Pelm International Corporation.. (Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stay Mon 03/13 3:37 PM
MOTION to Stay the Action Pending Plaintiffs Service on Foreign Defendants under The Hague Service Convention filed by Victoria E. Brieant, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 3/27/2023. Replies due by 4/3/2023.(Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting motion and setting a telephonic hearing to address whether the action should be stayed pending proper service of process on the foreign defendants pursuant to the Hague Service Convention, and setting a deadline for the Plaintiffs to perfect service of the summons and complaint on the foreign defendants pursuant to the Hague Service Convention
Monday, March 06, 2023
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 03/06 6:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS GROUPE PELM INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, LAW OFFICE OF VICTORIA E. BRIEANT, P.A. AND VICTORIA E. BRIEANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Groupe PELM International Corporation, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. and Victoria E. Brieant have filed a Motion to Quash Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Foreign Corporate Defendant set for 4/27/2023 01:00 PM. The magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defendants Groupe PELM International Corporation, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. and Victoria E. Brieant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Quash Mon 03/06 3:06 PM
MOTION to Quash Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Foreign Corporate Defendant filed by Groupe Pelm International Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 3/20/2023. Replies due by 3/27/2023.(Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion and Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Groupe Pelm International Corporations Motion to Quash Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Foreign Corporate Defendant
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/06 2:35 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re:18 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Victoria E. Brieant, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
18 18 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/03 12:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victoria E. Brieant, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A... (Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 02/16 8:32 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS LAW OFFICE OF VICTORIA E. BRIEANT, P.A. AND VICTORIA E. BRIEANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. and Victoria E. Brieant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/15 11:28 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. (Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Fri 02/10 12:55 PM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Groupe Pelm International Corporation. Related [+](dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)13
Thursday, February 09, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 02/09 4:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Default Judgment - by the Clerk Thu 02/09 4:30 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to GROUPE PELM INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION filed by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC.(Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 02/01 4:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS LAW OFFICE OF VICTORIA E. BRIEANT, P.A. AND VICTORIA E. BRIEANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. and Victoria E. Brieant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http:/ /cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/31 5:57 PM
DEFENDANTS LAW OFFICE OF VICTORIA E. BRIEANT, P.A. AND VICTORIA E. BRIEANTS ANSWER to Complaint with yes, trial by jury of all issues of fact triable to a jury byVictoria E. Brieant, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A.. (Brieant, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/24 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC. Groupe Pelm International Corporation served on 1/12/2023, answer due 2/2/2023. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/16 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC. Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A. served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/16 11:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC. Victoria E. Brieant served on 1/11/2023, answer due 2/1/2023. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 01/05 10:08 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ABN Corporation, RS Medical Supply, LLC.. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 01/05 9:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Victoria E. Brieant, Groupe Pelm International Corporation, Law Office of Victoria E. Brieant, P.A., Christian Pellegrini. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 01/05 9:22 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/03 10:10 AM
Proposed Summons. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/03 10:05 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by ABN CORPORATION, RS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC . (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/03 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17863549.). Filed byABN CORPORATION, RS MEDICAL SUPPLY, LLC. (Williams, Jimmie)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 01/03 10:48 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]