New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-00014
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2023 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
NYU Grossman School of Medicine
Represented By
Shari Danielle Steinfeld
Amabile & Erman, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NYU Langone Eye Center
Represented By
Shari Danielle Steinfeld
Amabile & Erman, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
New York Eye and Ear Infirmary of Mount Sinai
Represented By
Mallory Beth Turk
Aaronson Rappaport Feinstein & Deutsch
contact info
Defendant
Peter Weseley
Represented By
Shari Danielle Steinfeld
Amabile & Erman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hongwei Zhang
132-31 41st Ave. Apt. 2F
Flushing, NY 11355


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
77 77 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 9:16 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Document filed by Hongwei Zhang..(nd) Modified on 4/22/2025 (nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/22 9:12 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:76 Notice of Appeal,..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Tue 04/22 9:13 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hongwei Zhang were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 04/22 9:21 AM
***NOTICE TO FILER TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Hongwei Zhang to RE-FILE Document 77 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.. ERROR(S): Document is not signed. Re-file Using filing event Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis found under Motion. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
76 76 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 04/21 11:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from74 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,75 Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Hongwei Zhang. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Zhang, Hongwei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit ifp application