Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00014
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 03, 2023 3:50 AM PDT
Consol Claimant
Matthew Cady
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
TJ Lathrom
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jeffrey James
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Matthew Cady
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By
Thomas Lether
Lether Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Kiono Nelson
Represented By
Thomas D. D'Amore
D'Amore Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin Turner
D'Amore Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TMT Development Co., LLC
Defendant
Kari Nelson
Represented By
Thomas D. D'Amore
D'Amore Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin Turner
D'Amore Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
TJ Lathrom
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey James
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Logan Gimbel
Represented By
Andrew Todd Burns
Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP
contact info
Chester D. Hill
Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP
contact info
Defendant
D. Park Corporation
Defendant
Matthew Cady
Represented By
Margaret E. Schroeder
Miller Insurance Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By
Thomas Lether
Lether Law Group
contact info
Eric Jay Neal
Lether Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Tiffany Wolf
Terminated: 04/10/2023

GPO Sep 30 2024
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Matthew Cady, Jeffrey James, and TJ Lathrom's Motion for Stay of Plaintiff's Declaratory Claim With Regard to the Wolf Lawsuit, ECF 49, and Motion for Stay of Plaintiff's Declaratory Claim on Indemnity Coverage With Regard to the Nelson Lawsuit, ECF 51, are GRANTED. Plaintiff Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF 46, is DENIED with regard to the duty to defend in the Nelson Lawsuit. Defendants Matthew Cady, Jeffrey James, and TJ Lathrom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, ECF 62, is GRANTED with regard to the duty to defend in the Nelson Lawsuit and DENIED with regard to attorney fees.The parties shall confer within thirty days of this order and inform the Court how they intend to proceed with regard to the Wolf Lawsuit. The parties shall confer within thirty days of resolution of the Nelson Lawsuit and file a status report. Signed on 9/30/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)

Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
105 105 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 05/06 6:28 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. (to Amended Complaint, Dkt 36) , Counterclaim Against Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Filed by Jeffrey James(an individual), Matthew Cady, TJ Lathrom. (Farnell, Michael)
Related: [-]
104 104 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Tue 05/06 5:39 PM
Amended Answer to36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Against Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. Filed by Kari Nelson, Peter Glazer. (Farnell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
103 103 order Order on Motion for Leave Fri 05/02 3:57 PM
ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motions for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, ECF99 and101 , are GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file their amended answers and counterclaims promptly. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]