Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00015
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 04, 2023
Case in other court:U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 22-30954-thp13

Debtor
Greg Behnke

,
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2023 2:23 AM PDT
Appellant
Kelly Freed
P.O. Box 48
Oregon City, OR 97045
Appellee
Wayne Godare
Chapter 13 Trustee 222 SW Columbia St #1700
Portland, OR 97201
Represented By
Wayne Godare
contact info
Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
Represented By
Christian A. Torimino
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Benjamin Teich
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
order Dismissal -Terminate Case Tue 04/04 3:21 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), ECF12 , is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, ECF4 is DENIED as moot, and Plaintiff's Motions for Extension of Time to File a Response, ECF10 and ECF11 , are DENIED as moot. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 03/31 8:28 AM
Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Kelly Freed. (dino)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 03/02 11:13 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction4 . Filed by Kelly Freed. (dino)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 03/02 10:53 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction4 . Filed by Kelly Freed. (dino)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 02/27 3:13 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Judge Adrienne C. Nelson. (eo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/14 1:05 PM
Certificate of Service by US Trustee, Portland of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction because the appeal was filed late 4 Filed by US Trustee, Portland. (Teich, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Factual Declaration in Support of Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Factual Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Factual Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Factual Declaration
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 02/01 3:11 PM
Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Transmittal of Record for Bankruptcy Appeal Wed 02/01 3:10 PM
Transmittal of Record for Bankruptcy Appeal. (sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dkt 35 - Minute Order,
Att: 2 Dkt 37 - Notice of appeal of statement,
Att: 3 Dkt 38 - Notice of Filing of Appeal and Associated Deadlines
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 02/01 12:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction because the appeal was filed late . Filed by US Trustee, Portland. (Teich, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
service Clerks Notice of Mailing Wed 02/01 3:32 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kelly Freed regarding Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order6 . (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
3 3 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 01/17 1:04 PM
Notice of Appearance of Benjamin Teich appearing on behalf of US Trustee, Portland . Filed by on behalf of US Trustee, Portland. (Teich, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Wed 01/04 10:59 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 othinit Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court Wed 01/04 10:57 AM
Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court. Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 22-30954 thp13. No Filing Fee has been paid. Filed by Kelly Freed. (sb)
Related: [-]