California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00004
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2023 3:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Gassia Apkarian
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Katrina Foley
Plaintiff
Bryan Kaye
BK. NO. 3135708 318 South Melrose Street, Apt 2
Anaheim, CA 92805


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Friday, January 06, 2023
4 4 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 01/06 1:17 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge James V. Selna: Denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). As explained in the attached statement, because it is absolutely clear that the deficiencies in the complaint cannot be cured by amendment, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 01/05 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 01/05 11:33 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Bryan Kaye. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Thu 01/05 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Gassia Apkarian(Honorable Judge, official capacity), Gassia Apkarian(individual), Does(1-99, individual), Does(1-99, unknown County Employees, official capacity), Katrina Foley(individual), Katrina Foley(Orange County Supervisor, official capacity) Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick., filed by plaintiff Bryan Kaye. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71