Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan M Brnovich
Case #: 2:23-cv-00033
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2023
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2022-053266
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 3:48 AM MST
Defendant
Ryan Kilgore
Defendant
Berkley Aviation
Represented By
Jeffrey McKay Giancana
Kutak Rock Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Paul Sullivan Gerding, Jr.
Kutak Rock Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Defendant
Christina Kilgore
Defendant
Global Aerospace Incorporated
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
StarNet Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey McKay Giancana
Kutak Rock Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Paul Sullivan Gerding, Jr.
Kutak Rock Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Pierce
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
P&T Aerial LLC
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas N Talbott
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Talbott
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aerial Extreme LLC
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Pierce
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lebeau Trust October 2000
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Lebeau
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Lebeau
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle Landgren- Lee
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Landgren
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Agard
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adela Agard
Represented By
Joseph P Rocco
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info
Jason Scott Carr
Insurance Defense Law Group LLC
contact info

GPO Aug 09 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant StarNet Insurance Company and Berkley Aviation's 35 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED dismissing without prejudice Count 4 (bad faith) and Count 6 (aiding and abetting tortious conduct) and granting leave to amend within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Count 1 (garnishment), Count 3 (breach of contract), Count 8 (quasi estoppel), and Count 10 (estoppel). The Court will also dismiss with prejudice Count 5 (declaratory relief) only as to Plaintiffs' cause of action under Arizona's Unfair Claims Settlement Act, A.R.S. § 20-461, and Count 2 (declaratory relief) for claims relating to coverage as discussed above. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/9/2023. (ESG)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/12 1:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Orders (Docs.98 and100 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
Related: [-]