Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:23-cv-00060
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 6:47 AM EDT
Defendant
STEVEN FEELEY
2551 CANDYTUFT DRIVE
JAMISON, PA 18929
Plaintiff
CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC
607 Airport Blvd.
Doylestown, PA 18902
Represented By
WILLIAM RIESER
Sidney Gold & Associates
contact info
SIDNEY L. GOLD
Sidney L. Gold & Associates, PC
contact info
Unrepresented Party
STEVEN FEELEY
2551 CANDYTUFT DRIVE
JAMISON, PA 18929


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/03 12:25 PM
ORDER THAT THE DAMAGES HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/6/23 IS CANCELLED. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 11/3/23. 11/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/02 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 11/02 7:37 AM
DOC 13 MAILED TO UNREP (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/01 10:19 AM
ORDER THAT THE DAMAGES HEARING WILL PROCEED ON 11/6/23 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 13B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 10/31/23. 11/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 service Certificate of Service Fri 09/29 11:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC re11 Order,, Set Hearings, (RIESER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/19 11:50 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT IN AN AMOUNT TO BE DETERMINED BY THE COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A DAMAGES HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/6/23 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM TBD. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 9/19/23. 9/19/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Fri 07/28 4:51 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant, Steven Feeley filed by CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/18 2:31 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURTS RECORDS SHOWS THAT DEFENDANT, STEVEN FEELEY, HAS NOT FILED AN ANSWER OR PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT, AND DEFAULT WAS ENTERED AGAINST SAID DEFENDANT ON APRIL 25, 2023, IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. IF PLAINTIFF, CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC, DOES NOT TAKE ANY ACTION IN THIS CASE ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2023, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST STEVEN FEELEY FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 7/18/23. 7/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
8 8 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 04/26 2:29 PM
DEFAULT BY STEVEN FEELEY FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request for Default Tue 04/25 4:30 PM
Request for Default CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC against STEVEN FEELEY. (RIESER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Wed 04/26 2:30 PM
Default Entered (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
misc Remark Mon 04/24 7:50 AM
Document #6 Mailed to Defendant Steven Feeley. (DT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/21 3:25 PM
NOTICE THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S RECORDS SHOWS THAT DEFENDANT, STEVE FEELEY, HAS NOT FILED AN ANSWER OR PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. IF PLAINTIFF DOES NOT TAKE ANY ACTION IN THIS CASE, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST STEVE FEELEY FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 4/21/23. 4/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
misc Remark Fri 02/03 8:24 AM
PAPER #5 MAILED TO THE UNREP (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 02/02 3:54 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/2/23. 2/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/02 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM RIESER on behalf of CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC (RIESER, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/02 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC re: B&R served Summons and Complaint upon STEVEN FEELEY by personal service. STEVEN FEELEY served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 01/09 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to STEVEN FEELEY. Forwarded To: counsel on 1/9/23. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/06 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against STEVEN FEELEY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16414207.), filed by CLEANSPACE MODULAR LLC.(GOLD, SIDNEY)
Related: [-]