New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:23-cv-00140
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2023
Terminated:Mar 13, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Shane Richardson
15023 West Lake Front Drive
Gonzales, LA 70737
Defendant
Clearview Cable LLC
Plaintiff
Turtle & Hughes, Inc.
Represented By
Jill Levi
Todd & Levi, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 13, 2023
13 13 order Judgment Mon 03/13 5:55 PM
JUDGMENT: On March 10, 2023, the Defendants having filed an Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68 (the "Rule 68 Offer"), and on March 10, 2023, the Plaintiff having accepted the Rule 68 Offer; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is hereby entered against each of the Defendants, jointly and severally, in the total amount of $341,268.41, which includes the principal amount of $301,720.16, service charges in the amount of $30,048.25, and attorneys' fees in the amount of $9,500.00. The Clerk is directed to mark this case as closed. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/13/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 03/10 1:03 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Re: Document No.11 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 03/10 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/10 7:34 AM
NOTICE of Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68. Document filed by Clearview Cable LLC, Shane Richardson..(Jones, Tanner)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 03/10 1:17 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 11 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 03/10 1:18 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 12 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
9 9 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/03 5:28 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Plaintiff and the Defendants that: a) the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint dated January 6, 2023, is hereby extended to March 8, 2023; and b) the Defendants hereby waive any objection to this Court's jurisdiction and to the manner of service of the Summons and Complaint. This is the first extension of time requested by the Defendants. SO ORDERED. Clearview Cable LLC answer due 3/8/2023; Shane Richardson answer due 3/8/2023. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/3/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
8 8 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 02/02 5:55 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 01/31 2:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Shane Richardson served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. Service was accepted by Tonya Richardson, wife. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 01/31 2:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Clearview Cable LLC served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023. Service was accepted by Brad Lavigne, Safety Director. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/09 3:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/09 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview Cable LLC, Shane Richardson..(gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/09 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jill Levi. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/09 3:34 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/09 3:34 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/09 3:35 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/06 5:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview Cable LLC d/b/a Clearview Solar and Shane Richardson, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/06 5:29 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/06 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Clearview Cable LLC d/b/a Clearview Solar, Shane Richardson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27172124)Document filed by Turtle & Hughes, Inc...(Levi, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Settlement Letter Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Promissory Note and Personal Guaranty