Bell v. British Embassy et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Rochon |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00188 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 6:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
British Embassy
3100 Massachusetts Ave, N
Washington, DC 20008 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UK Department of International Trade
885 2nd Ave
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Bell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Ashley Bell and Defendants British Embassy and UK Department for Business and Trade (formerly known as UK Department for International Trade) (collectively, "Defendants"), by and through their undersigned counsel, that the above-captioned action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with no award of attorneys fees or costs by the Court to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/28/2023) (jca) |
|
22 | 22
![]() PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade..(Zoldessy, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL The Court having been advised at ECF No. 20 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/1/2023) (jca) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
adr
Mediation Conference Scheduled
Mon 06/12 2:12 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Fri 05/12 6:22 PM
ORDER. To provide the parties with sufficient time to complete mediation, the initial pretrial conference is hereby adjourned to August 17, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba) |
||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Thu 05/11 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/12/2023.(ah) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Patrick Hilferty on behalf of Ashley Bell..(Hilferty, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/23/2023. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/01/2015) (rpr) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade..(Zoldessy, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jason A. Zoldessy dated April 14, 2023. Request GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to May 1, 2023. SO ORDERED. British Embassy answer due 5/1/2023; UK Department of International Trade answer due 5/1/2023. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 4/14/2023) (jca) |
|
14 | 14
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Jason A. Zoldessy dated April 14, 2023. Document filed by British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade..(Zoldessy, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sydney Mendelsohn on behalf of British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade..(Mendelsohn, Sydney) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A Zoldessy on behalf of British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade..(Zoldessy, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. UK Department of International Trade waiver sent on 2/14/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. British Embassy waiver sent on 2/14/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/13/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/13/2023) (jca) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. British Embassy served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. Service was accepted by Danny Collyer, Security Manager. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
7 | 7
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. UK Department of International Trade served on 1/27/2023, answer due 2/17/2023. Service was accepted by Julio C.. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UK Department of International Trade..(jgo) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to British Embassy..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 01/10 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 01/10 11:22 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 01/10 11:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UK Department for International Trade, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to British Embassy, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hudler, Samantha) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against British Embassy, UK Department of International Trade. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-27179776)Document filed by Ashley Bell..(Hudler, Samantha) |