Wyoming District Court
Judge:Alan B Johnson
Referred: Kelly H Rankin - Do Not U
Case #: 2:23-cv-00006
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 3:53 AM MDT
Defendant
Keith Allen Adels
Plaintiff
DTC Energy Group Inc
Represented By
Ezekiel J Williams
Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
36 36 notice Notice Vacating Hearing Thu 08/29 9:52 AM
(TEXT-ONLY) Notice Vacating Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/9/2024 is VACATED (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 08/29 9:51 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting34 Motion to Withdraw Document. The29 Writ of Continuing Garnishment on Flo Rite Fluids is withdrawn. (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
34 34 3 pgs motion Withdraw Document Tue 08/27 4:32 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin - DO NOT USE. MOTION to Withdraw Document29 Writ of Garnishment filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Ferguson, Janette) Modified on 8/27/2024 (Court Staff, ssw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Motions No Longer Referred Tue 08/27 4:52 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:34 MOTION to Withdraw Document29 Writ of Garnishment (Court Staff, ssw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 08/23 4:35 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. ***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Status Conference reset for 9/9/2024 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 08/21 2:49 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. ***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Status Conference re garnishment set for 8/27/2024 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Writ of Garnishment Thu 04/11 12:33 PM
WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT Issued to Adels Consulting LLC (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Privacy Letter
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/11 12:16 PM
ORDER FOR SERVICE of Writ re27 Application for Writ to Adels Consulting LLC by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Writ of Garnishment Thu 04/11 11:44 AM
WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT Issued to Flo Rite Fluids Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Privacy Letter
28 28 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/11 11:39 AM
ORDER FOR SERVICE of Writ re26 Application for Writ to Flo Rite Fluids Inc by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
27 27 misc Application Mon 04/08 1:56 PM
APPLICATION Request for Writ of Continuing Garnishment by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc. (Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 2 Order for Service Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 3 Return of Service,
Att: 4 Notice of Right to Hearing,
Att: 5 Verified Answer to Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 6 Order Setting Hearing,
Att: 7 Letter re Privacy Notification
26 26 misc Application for Writ Mon 04/08 1:50 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment by DTC Energy Group Inc. (Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 2 Order for Service Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 3 Return of Service,
Att: 4 Notice of Right to Hearing,
Att: 5 Verified Answer to Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 6 Order Setting Hearing,
Att: 7 Letter re Privacy Notification
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Wed 09/27 3:16 PM
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting22 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Calculation of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Amend Default Judgment. See order for details. (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
24 24 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/18 2:00 PM
Verified Answer by Defendant Keith Allen Adels to19 Writ of Garnishment (Court Staff, sal)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
23 23 11 pgs service Writ Returned Fri 09/15 2:10 PM
WRIT of Continuing Garnishment returned Executed on 9/6/23 upon Mariah Adels. (Court Staff, sal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
22 22 motion Attorney Fees Thu 09/07 4:33 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees to Support Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Calculation of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Amend Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
21 21 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/30 3:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc (Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/30 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc (Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
19 19 order Writ of Garnishment Mon 08/28 4:29 PM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Privacy Letter
18 18 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/28 4:20 PM
ORDER FOR SERVICE of Writ by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
17 17 misc Application for Writ Fri 08/25 1:28 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment by DTC Energy Group Inc. (Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 2 Order for Service,
Att: 3 Return of Service,
Att: 4 Notice of Right to Hearing,
Att: 5 Verified Answer to Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 6 Order Setting Hearing,
Att: 7 Letter RE: Privacy Notification
16 16 order Order Fri 08/25 9:26 AM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. This matter is before the Court on15 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment. After reviewing Plaintiff's Motion, the Court requires Plaintiff to file an itemized bill to support the additional $7,117.50 in attorneys' fees on or before September 8, 2023. (Court Staff, ssw) Modified text on 8/25/2023 (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
15 15 motion Alter/Amend Judgment Tue 08/15 11:40 AM
MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment and Supplement Calculation of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 05/02 3:25 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered against Defendant, Keith Allen Adels, for $296,637.49 for damages and applicable interest to date for breach of the Personal Guaranty; $3,194.00 in attorneys' fees; and costs of $1,002.00. Case closed. (Judgment mailed to defendant on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
13 13 order Reassigning Case Tue 04/18 2:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B Johnson and Honorable Kelly H Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings; by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, smxb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
12 12 7 pgs motion Default Judgment Mon 04/17 2:26 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, Keith Allen Adels filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Ferguson, Janette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Andrew Meyers,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Janette L. Ferguson,
Att: 8 Exhibit A,
Att: 9 Exhibit B,
Att: 10 Exhibit C,
Att: 11 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/12 2:09 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable on April 10, 2023. Mail sent to Mr. Keith Allen Adels (Court Staff, szf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
misc Financial Entry Fri 03/31 1:58 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR JANETTE L FERGUSON. RECEIPT 2-1308 (Court Staff, sjk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/29 10:41 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting9 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting Janette L. Ferguson for Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc. Emailed counsel on this date.(Court Staff, smxb)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/29 10:10 AM
MOTION for Janette L. Ferguson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Detainer Declaration of Janette L. Ferguson in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration - 2023 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, March 23, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/23 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc (Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
7 7 1 pgs misc Clerks Entry of Default Thu 03/16 2:43 PM
CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Keith Allen Adels by Margaret Botkins, Clerk of Court. Entry sent to Defendant via Certified First Class US Mail on March 16, 2023. (Court Staff, szf)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Entry of Default Thu 03/16 12:58 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant, Keith Allen Adels, filed by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc.(Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Signed Declaration in Support of Motion for Entry of Default,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 1 to Williams Declaration, Summons,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 2 to Williams Declaration, Return of Service,
Att: 4 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
5 5 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff DTC Energy Group Inc (Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/09 4:27 PM
Summons Issued (Court Staff, sjj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed Mon 01/09 4:23 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, sjj)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Mon 01/09 3:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by DTC Energy Group, Inc.,. (Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 01/09 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Keith Allen Adels (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BWYDC-2207699) Attorney Ezekiel J Williams added to party DTC Energy Group, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by DTC Energy Group, Inc.. (Williams, Ezekiel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons in a Civil Action