Original Case: 1:22-cv-02398

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-prici-10032
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2023 3:22 AM EST
SERVICE
Represented By
Adam Gershenson
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Dane Robert Voris
Cooley, LLP
contact info
William Coppedge Collins Jr.
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Joseph Hubert Stuhrenberg
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
TERMINUS SOFTWARE, INC.
Represented By
Michael Rollins
Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher, LLP
contact info
Katherine A. Roush
Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher, LLP
contact info
Steven G. Hall
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DEMOBLOX, INC.
Represented By
Robert David Gallo
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey D. Horst
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Halsey G. Knapp Jr.
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info
Kana Caplan
Krevolin & Horst, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/10/2023 3:22 AM EST
Thursday, January 05, 2023
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terminus Software, Inc. on 01/04/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/23/2023 as to Appellant Terminus Software, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/06/2023 as to Appellee DemoBlox, Inc.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 4 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 4 pgs NOA
Att: 4 10 pgs DC ORDER, DE #111