Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-14253

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:23-ap-01004
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson
14476 Black Bear Road
West Palm Beach, FL 33418
Represented By
Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, July 31, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/31 12:27 PM
Certificate of Service Order Dismissing Adversary Case Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Related [+]. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (TEXT ONLY)
Thursday, July 27, 2023
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/27 2:25 PM
Adversary Case 9:23-ap-1004 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-]
22 22 ordertext Order Dismissing Adversary Case as Settled (TEXT ONLY) [CRD ONLY] Thu 07/27 2:24 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding as Settled Per DE#223 in the Main Case. ***The parties in this adversary proceeding have reached a settlement. The settlement agreement was filed in the main bankruptcy case, and the Court has entered an order in the main case approving the settlement agreement. Therefore, this adversary proceeding is DISMISSED AS SETTLED. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. This dismissal does not affect the validity or enforceability of any judgment entered before or after entry of this Order. Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Mindy A Mora . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
21 21 ordertext Order to Continue Pretrial Conference (TEXT ONLY) Wed 06/14 3:34 PM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Per Hearing Held 06/14/2023 @10:00am Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson. SO ORDERED by Judge Mindy A Mora . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). Scheduling Conference Continued to 07/14/2023 at 01:00 PM by Video Conference. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/08 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference (Re: 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/14/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/06 11:17 AM
Certificate of Service Order Continuing Scheduling Conference [D.E. 18] Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Related [+]. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-] 18 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
Monday, June 05, 2023
18 18 3 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Mon 06/05 12:53 PM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 06/14/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Tue 05/30 1:55 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy , Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Related [+]. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement , Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/20 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference (Re: 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/17/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Monday, April 17, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Mon 04/17 11:01 AM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/17/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 23, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Thu 03/23 10:07 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement , Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/17 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference (Re: 1 Complaint). Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/12/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Tue 03/14 1:28 PM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/12/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 09, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/10 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Response to Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint (Re:6 ). Deadline Extended to 03/23/2023
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/08 2:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Related [+]. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
9 9 order Extend Time Order Tue 03/07 12:22 PM
Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Response to Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Deadline Extended to 03/23/2023 (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] #6
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Related [+]. (Brennan, John)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing
Friday, February 10, 2023
7 7 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 02/10 5:12 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Thursday, February 09, 2023
6 6 motion Extend Time Thu 02/09 4:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (Brennan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Answer Due 2/9/2023 (Re:1 Adversary case 23-01004 Complaint by Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson against JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson) Scheduling Conference to be held on 03/15/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
3 3 7 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 01/10 10:19 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 01/10 10:18 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA Answer Due 2/9/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 03/15/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01004 Complaint by Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson against JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/10 10:15 AM
Adversary case 23-01004 Complaint by Sherron Haffenden Wilkinson against JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA . Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Cover Sheet