Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Referred: David H Hennessy
Case #: 4:23-cv-40004
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2023 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Town of Bolton
663 Main Street
Bolton, MA 01740
Represented By
Robert B. Gibbons
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee
contact info
David K. McCay
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Louggee, LLP
contact info
Noah A. Ligeti
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee
contact info
Danielle M Kemp
Mirick O'Connell
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan DiPietro
110 Teele Road
Bolton, MA 01740
Represented By
Joshua Polk
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
John C. La Liberte
Pioneer Legal
contact info
Christina Marie Martin
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


1. Federal lawsuit challenges tax foreclosure law (salemnews.com)
Submitted Tue 01/17/2023
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
96 96 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/27 10:39 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting95 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines. (SF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
95 95 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 02/26 2:50 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines by Alan DiPietro.(Polk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order