Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Case #: 3:23-cv-30004
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2023 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Vimeo
555 West 18th Street
New York, NY 10011
Represented By
Megan C. Deluhery
Todd & Weld
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Jorge
1145 Liberty St.
Springfield, MA 01104

GPO Feb 22 2024
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The court, upon de novo review, hereby ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation. As a result, Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. This case shall be closed. See attached memorandum and order for complete details. (Lendon, Tyler)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
120 120 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 04/10 8:13 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to108 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rafael Jorge. Appeal108 Terminated (MAP)
Related: [-]