Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-11686

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:23-ap-01002
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2023
Terminated:Apr 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Triet Minh Dinh
Represented By
Triet Minh Dinh
contact info
Plaintiff
G & L Seafood Inc., a California Corporation
2416 Chico Ave
South El Monte, CA 91733
Represented By
Peter J Ryan
Flores Ryan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
2416 Chico Ave
South El Monte, CA 91733
Represented By
Peter J Ryan
Flores Ryan LLP
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
Karen Sue Naylor, Trustee 4910 Birch Street, Suite 120
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/11 3:56 PM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-1002 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (AM)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/27 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 25, 2024
22 22 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Mon 03/25 5:47 PM
ORDER On Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) - IT IS ORDERED THAT the Stipulation is approved, and the above-entitled action is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed on 3/25/2024. (GD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
21 21 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 03/14 3:35 PM
Hearing Held Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] - Off calendar (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
20 20 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 03/14 2:05 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion is granted. Movant to submit order. (GD)
Related: [-] 15 Joint Motion To Approve Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc.
Thursday, February 15, 2024
19 19 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 02/15 1:23 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to March 14, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Fri 02/09 10:07 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 3/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc.
17 17 misc Declaration Fri 02/09 5:11 AM
Declaration re: OF PETER J. RYAN ISO JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding JOINT ,16 Stipulation By G & L Seafood Inc. and JOINT
16 16 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 02/09 5:05 AM
Stipulation By G & L Seafood Inc. and JOINT Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Fri 02/09 5:01 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding JOINT Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
14 14 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 12/14 3:27 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to February 15, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
13 13 notice Notice Tue 12/05 11:30 AM
Notice NOTICE OF CONTIUANCE OF HEARING Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc.. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 10/12 1:22 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
11 11 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 10/10 4:37 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. The PDF is captioned as a Pretrial Order. However, it does not appear to be an order THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 10 Status report filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc.
10 10 misc Status report Tue 10/10 6:48 AM
Status report Pretrial Order Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Saturday, April 08, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 04/08 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 06, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Thu 04/06 4:00 PM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/6/2023. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert Pre-Trial Order due by 9/28/2023. Discovery due by 9/1/2023. (GD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
7 7 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/30 3:24 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held - Hearing Setting Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Deadline for completing discovery: September 1, 2023; Last date for filing pre-trial motions: September 22, 2023; Pre-trial conference on: October 12, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.; Joint pre-trial stipulation and/or order due per local rules; Plaintiff's counsel to submit scheduling order. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 misc Status report Wed 03/22 11:39 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, March 20, 2023
5 5 misc Status report Mon 03/20 3:10 PM
Defendant Triet Minh Dinh Status Report Filed by Defendant Triet Minh Dinh Related [+]. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, February 13, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/13 12:22 PM
Defendant Triet Minh Dinh Answer/Response to Complaint Filed by Triet Minh Dinh . (GD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 02/07 2:57 PM
Proof of service RE: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING [LBR 7004-1]; AND COMPLAINT OBJECTING TO DISCHARGE BASED ON FALSE OATH PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C.A. SECTION 727(4)(A) Filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc.. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 01/09 5:10 PM
Summons Issued on Triet Minh Dinh Date Issued 1/9/2023, Answer Due 2/8/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (SD8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff G & L Seafood Inc., Plaintiff Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/09 3:15 PM
Adversary case 8:23-ap-01002. Complaint by G & L Seafood Inc. a California Corporation, Anne-Marie Giang Trustee of the Long and Anne Family Trust against Triet Minh Dinh. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]