Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Robert L Miller, Jr
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00023
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2023 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
334 N. Senate Ave
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Jeremiah J Wood
Baker & Hostetler Llp - Col/oh
contact info
Defendant
Forest River, Inc.
55470 County Road 1
Elkhart, IN 46514
Represented By
John D Papageorge
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Kevin K. Fitzharris
BARRETT McNAGNY 215 East Berry Street
Fort Wayne, IN 46801
Plaintiff
Wesley Boniface
3408 Grants Landing
Ft. Worth, TX 76179
Represented By
Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Burdge Law Office Co Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
20 20 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 06/27 3:53 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (nhc)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/27 3:47 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal18 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/27/2023. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
18 18 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 06/26 10:58 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Forest River, Inc.. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/14 11:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING16 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Dismissal Papers, by Defendant Forest River, Inc. and DIRECTS the parties to file dismissal papers on or before 6/26/2023. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/14/2023. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 06/12 11:06 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Dismissal Papers by Defendant Forest River, Inc.. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/12 1:02 PM
ORDER: Based on the mediator's report that this case has been settled14 , the court vacates the 4/3/2023, order concerning the Rule 16 preliminary pretrial conference, vacates the Rule 16 preliminary pretrial conference set for 5/2/2023, and directs the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal within 60 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/12/2023. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
14 14 adr Report of Mediation Tue 04/11 9:59 AM
Final REPORT of Mediation by Kevin K. Fitzharris.(Fitzharris, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
13 13 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 04/03 3:31 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/03 3:30 PM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/24/2023. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2023 10:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/3/23. (slm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/13 2:54 PM
Forest River's ANSWER to1 Complaint, Affirmative and other defenses by Forest River, Inc..(Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
10 10 adr Report of Mediation Tue 03/07 11:33 AM
Interim REPORT of Mediation by Kevin K. Fitzharris.(Fitzharris, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/01 11:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/01 11:21 AM
Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Ford Motor Company.(Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/25 4:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Forest River, Inc... (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D Papageorge on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Papageorge, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/20 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesley Boniface. Ford Motor Company served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023.(Wells, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Fed Ex Proof of Service
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/20 3:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wesley Boniface. Forest River, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Wells, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/11 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/11 9:54 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/10 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Company, Forest River, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5127285.), filed by Wesley Boniface.(Wells, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons