California Central District Court
Case #: 2:23-cv-00161
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Terminated:Jan 19, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2023 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Plaintiff
Ninoska Osorio


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 19, 2023
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Thu 01/19 4:53 PM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/12 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (jtil)
Related: [-]