South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 0:23-cv-00086
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2023
Terminated:Apr 21, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Renaud
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Ruth Checketts
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles
Represented By
Ashley Anne McMahan
Mcmahan Law LLC
contact info
Mary Lynn Anna Tedesco
Tedesco Legal PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 21, 2023
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/21 11:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles. (McMahan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 03/28 3:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Daniel Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Checketts, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/16 6:19 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Daniel Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Checketts, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/08 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Checketts on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Checketts, Ruth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/08 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Checketts on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Daniel Renaud (Checketts, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Mon 02/20 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles. Merrick B. Garland served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023; Ur M. Jaddou served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023; Daniel Renaud served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (McMahan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/24 10:15 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mary Lynn Anna Tedesco for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/24/23. (alew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 01/11 10:36 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Lynn Tedesco ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10887266) by Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(McMahan, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notarized App for PHV,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed PHV Order
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 01/10 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Daniel Renaud, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(alew, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary/Department of Homeland Security,
Att: 2 Summons Daniel Renaud, Director Vermont Service Center,
Att: 3 Summons Ur M. Jaddou/Office of the General Counsel,
Att: 4 Summons Merrick Garland/Attorney General of the United States
Friday, January 06, 2023
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 01/10 11:40 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles.(alew, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Tue 01/10 11:39 AM
Complaint for a Writ of Mandamus and Petition for a Hearing ( Filing fee $ 402. Receipt number ASCDC-10880100.), filed by Felix Ricardo Saldierna Mireles.(alew, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-I-797A, Notice of Action-Department of Homeland Security,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-I-918 Supplement B U Nonimmigrant Status Certification Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Synergie of Wellness, L3C Psychological-Psychiatric Evaluation re: Mr. Saldierna-Mireles,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Mr. Saldierna-Mireles Mecklenburg County Criminal Records,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Letter from attorney Rob Heroy re: Mr. Saldierna-Mireles' criminal record,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-I-797C, Notice of Action-Department of Homeland Security,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-US Citizenship and Immigration Services Decision,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-US Citizenship and Immigration Services re: Adjustment of Status,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-Form I-290B Statement