Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:23-cv-00057
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2023
Terminated:Jun 22, 2023
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2022-094430
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 1:42 AM MST
Defendant
Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC
Represented By
Leah S Freed
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Ricardo Robinson Bours
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Caroline Kathleen Larsen
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Defendant
Suns Legacy Partners LLC
Represented By
Leah S Freed
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Ricardo Robinson Bours
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Caroline Kathleen Larsen
Thorpe Shwer PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cass Monroe
Represented By
Jody Lynn Broaddus
Attorneys For Freedom Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Martese Monroe
Represented By
Jody Lynn Broaddus
Attorneys For Freedom Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Phoenix Area Development LP
Terminated: 01/09/2023


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, June 22, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/22 4:06 PM
ORDER - The Stipulation to Dismiss (Doc.16 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; and the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/21/23. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss Case Wed 06/21 10:40 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss Case 2:23-cv-00057-SPL by Cass Monroe, Martese Monroe.(Broaddus, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal
Thursday, May 11, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 05/11 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (Robinson Bours, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/28 4:42 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Statement by Cass Monroe, Martese Monroe . (Broaddus, Jody)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/31 3:18 PM
RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/26/2024. Dispositive motions due by 3/29/2024. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/31/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 03/31 3:14 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for April 7, 2023 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/31/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
11 11 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 03/28 11:49 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cass Monroe, Martese Monroe.(Broaddus, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 03/01 11:21 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See attached PDF for complete details . Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/28/23.(MJW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Tue 01/31 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Leah S Freed. (Freed, Leah)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
8 8 misc Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant Mon 01/23 5:05 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (Robinson Bours, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 misc Supplement Tue 01/17 6:59 PM
SUPPLEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC.(Robinson Bours, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/17 6:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (Robinson Bours, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/17 6:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC.(Robinson Bours, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Wed 01/11 9:49 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/10/23. (MJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/10 4:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Phoenix Area Development LP, Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (REM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
2 2 misc New Case Opened Tue 01/10 4:16 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21475561. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-00057 PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 01/10 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-094430. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21475561 filed by Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC, Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (Larsen, Caroline)(REM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 22 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
service Service Executed Tue 01/10 4:11 PM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration Upon Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC to CT Corporation System Scott Whaley (Agent) (Statutory Agent) on 12/8/2022 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/9/2022) ; Upon Suns Legacy Partners LLC to CT Corporation System Scott Whaley (Agent) (Statutory Agent) on 12/8/2022 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/9/2022) (REM)
Related: [-]
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration Upon Phoenix Mercury Basketball LLC to CT Corporation System Scott Whaley (Agent) (Statutory Agent) on 12/8/2022 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/9/2022) ; Upon Suns Legacy Partners LLC to CT Corporation System Scott Whaley (Agent) (Statutory Agent) on 12/8/2022 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/9/2022) (REM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]