Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:23-cv-00083
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446bc - Notice of Removal -- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2023
Terminated:Jan 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2023 2:51 AM MDT
Defendant
John Paul Luman
Represented By
Alicia Margaret Reinken
Robinson & Henry, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nicole L Luman
Represented By
Alicia Margaret Reinken
Robinson & Henry, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hi-Point Home Builders, LLC
Represented By
Jason Patrick Kane
Ranson & Kane PC
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE, on or before January 23, 2023, why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/11/2023. (sdunb, )
GPO Jan 27 2023
y Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/27/2023. (trvo, )ORDER OF REMAND. The Order to Show Cause [Doc. 8] is MADE ABSOLUTE. This case is REMANDED to the District Court of El Paso County, Colorado, where it was originally filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. B

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, January 27, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/27 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re13 Order to the El Paso County District Court at Helen.Doerer@judicial.state.co.us. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Minute Order Fri 01/27 1:47 PM
ORDER OF REMAND. The Order to Show Cause [Doc.8 ] is MADE ABSOLUTE . This case is REMANDED to the District Court of El Paso County, Colorado, where it was originally filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/27/2023. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 01/27 1:54 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Order13 filed in this case on 1/27/2023. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
12 12 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 01/23 5:01 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Dated January 11, 2023 re8 by Defendants John Paul Luman, Nicole L Luman. Related [+]
Related: [-] inken, Alicia
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Contract
Friday, January 20, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 01/20 8:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED in part . Regardless of whether this case is in federal or state court, a responsive pleading will be required, so the substance of Defendants' responsive pleading is not dependent upon the Court's jurisdiction over this case. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/1/2023 . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/20/2023. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 01/17 5:36 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants John Paul Luman, Nicole L Luman. Related [+]
Related: [-] inken, Alicia
Thursday, January 12, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 01/12 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Patrick Kane on behalf of Hi-Point Home Builders, LLCAttorney Jason Patrick Kane added to party Hi-Point Home Builders, LLC(pty:pla) (Kane, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
8 8 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/11 2:32 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE , on or before January 23, 2023 , why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/11/2023. (sdunb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
7 7 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 01/11 8:36 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs misc Order - State Court Wed 01/11 8:35 AM
STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Complaint. By Gregory Robert Werner, District Court Judge, El Paso County, on 01/02/2023. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 01/11 8:31 AM
COMPLAINT against John Paul Luman, Nicole L Luman, filed by Hi-Point Home Builders, LLC.(tgall, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 01/10 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicole L Luman, John Paul Luman from Hi-Point Home Builders LLC v. Luman, John Paul et al, Case Number 2022CV032033. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8877709), filed by Nicole L Luman, John Paul Luman. Related [+]
Related: [-] inken, Alicia
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9
misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Wed 01/11 8:27 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:1 Notice of Removal Of Civil Action, filed by attorney Alicia Margaret Reinken. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Wed 01/11 8:28 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 01/11 8:30 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]