Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Timothy P O'Hara
Case #: 1:23-cv-00091
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2023 3:13 AM MDT
Defendant
West Star Aviation, LLC
Represented By
Michael Craig Santo
Bechtel & Santo
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel A. Rupp
Represented By
Daphne Shih Gebauer
Tava Employment Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
77 77 order Order Tue 04/15 10:57 AM
ORDER: At the request of the parties, Virtual Final Pretrial Conference re-set for 6/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before District Judge Gordon P Gallagher. Conference which had been set for 5/9/2025 is hereby Vacated. For log-in questions, please email the Courtroom Deputy at Donald_Clement@cod.uscourts.gov. By District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 15, 2025. Text Only Entry. (gpglc3) Modified on 4/15/2025 to correct time of hearing (dclem)
Related: [-]