California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:22-cv-08981
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2023 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Gen Digital Inc.
Represented By
Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Tyce Randall Walters
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Serrin A. Turner
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael H. Rubin
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jumpshot, Inc.
Represented By
Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Tyce Randall Walters
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Serrin A. Turner
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael H. Rubin
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Karwowski
Represented By
Ekwan Eric Rhow
Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg And Rhow
contact info
Jonathan Moshe Rotter
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Amanda Kate Klevorn
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Korey Arthur Nelson
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
David Jay Stone
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Marc E. Masters
Bird, Marella, Boxer, Et Al.
contact info
Claire Bosarge
Burns Charest, LLP
contact info
Oliver Rocos
Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg & Rhow
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace Lau
Represented By
Ekwan Eric Rhow
Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg And Rhow
contact info
Jonathan Moshe Rotter
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Amanda Kate Klevorn
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
Korey Arthur Nelson
Burns Charest LLP
contact info
David Jay Stone
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Marc E. Masters
Bird, Marella, Boxer, Et Al.
contact info
Claire Bosarge
Burns Charest, LLP
contact info
Oliver Rocos
Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg & Rhow
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
49 49 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 11/27 3:25 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions Related [+] must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court’s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes. 9. On or before December 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed : The date the case was filed; b. Parties : A list or description of each party; c. Claims : A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts : A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues : A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief : A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery : The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases : The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History : A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines : A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines : Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate : Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency : Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists. 10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. 11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the [LINK:Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 11/27/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] gardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing
Thursday, October 19, 2023
48 48 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/19 8:12 AM
ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 46 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2023. Motions due by 12/4/2023. Responses due by 1/19/2024. Replies due by 2/20/2024. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
47 47 64 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/18 3:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byGrace Lau, Christopher Karwowski, Melody Klein, Michael McBride, Aimen Halim. (Rhow, Ekwan)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/18 9:50 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re45 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau, Gen Digital Inc. and Jumpshot Inc. (Rhow, Ekwan) Modified on 10/18/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
45 45 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/13 8:44 AM
ORDER by Judge Tigar GRANTING 25 IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER TERMINATING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
44 44 order Order Tue 09/12 6:03 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint, ECF No. 39, is STAYED pending further court order. The Court will issue an order on the pending motion to dismiss shortly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
43 43 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/07 4:17 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 1, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to39 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
42 42 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/07 2:42 PM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret A. Upshaw.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/07 9:55 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Margaret A. Upshaw ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18620863.) filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc..(Upshaw, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, September 01, 2023
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 09/01 3:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint. ECF No.25 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, September 14, 2023 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/01 1:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.(Rotter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Marc E. Masters,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Redline Comparison,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Email Communications,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
38 38 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/21 11:44 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The motion hearing set for 6/29/2023 is CONTINUED. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 13, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
37 37 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 05/17 3:50 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byGen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint
Monday, April 17, 2023
36 36 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 04/17 7:26 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byChristopher Karwowski, Grace Lau. (Rhow, Ekwan)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint
Monday, March 20, 2023
35 35 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/20 8:31 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 34 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and all Associated Deadlines.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/20 8:36 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2023. Motions due by 5/31/2023. Responses due by 7/14/2023. Replies due by 8/14/2023. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/17 12:25 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and all Associated Deadlines filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc..(Turner, Serrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Serrin Turner
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/07 9:07 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Claire Bosarge.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/07 9:05 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Amanda Klevorn.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/07 9:02 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Korey Nelson.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
30 30 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/06 11:59 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18046058.) filed by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.(Bosarge, Claire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
29 29 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/06 11:54 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18046032.) filed by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.(Klevorn, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/06 11:49 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18045875.) filed by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.(Nelson, Korey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/01 10:56 AM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. The motion hearing set for 6/1/2023 is CONTINUED. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 28, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
26 26 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 02/24 4:24 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re25 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed byGen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc.. Related [+] (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 35 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 02/24 4:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/17/2023. Replies due by 5/17/2023.(Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael H. Rubin,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/24 8:47 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tyce Walters.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/24 8:46 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Serrin Turner.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/23 1:11 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Tyce Walters ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18015523.) filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc..(Walters, Tyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/23 1:07 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Serrin Turner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18015489.) filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc..(Turner, Serrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, January 13, 2023
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 01/13 4:29 PM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 12 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion to Dismiss due by 2/24/2023. Opposition due by 4/17/2023. Reply due by 5/17/2023. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 01/13 8:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanc ed notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 10, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zo om/] . Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/12 5:37 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gen Digital Inc. for Jumpshot, Inc.. (Correction of Docket # 13 ) (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/12 9:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
16 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
15 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc... (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc., Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.(Rubin, Michael) Modified on 1/12/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael H. Rubin
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Marilyn Blunschi on behalf of Defendants Gen Digital Inc. and Jumpshot Inc. (Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin on behalf of Defendants Gen Digital Inc. and Jumpshot Inc. (Rubin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
9 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau.. (Stone, David)
Related: [-]
***Consent/Declination Deadline terminated, See Docket No.9 .*** (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
8 8 1 pgs Summons Issued as to Jumpshot, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
7 7 Proposed Summons. (Rotter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to Gen Digital Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: David Jay Stone. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #:1 Complaint filed by G race Lau, Christopher Karwowski ). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Karwowski, Grace Lau re1 Complaint (Rotter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons. (Rotter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Gen Digital Inc., Jumpshot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17837304.). Filed byGrace Lau, Christopher Karwowski.(Rotter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet