Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-00491
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-03124
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2023 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
CARLOS VARGAS
Represented By
SAMIRA KHAZAELI
Gori Law Firm Pc - Edwardsville Il
contact info
EVAN D BUXNER
Gori Julian & Associates - Edwardsville Il
contact info
NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD
The Gori Law Firm - Edwardsville Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 26, 2023
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/26 10:13 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by CARLOS VARGAS. (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/26 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN D BUXNER on behalf of CARLOS VARGAS (BUXNER, EVAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS RYAN MAYFIELD on behalf of CARLOS VARGAS (MAYFIELD, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/25 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMIRA KHAZAELI on behalf of CARLOS VARGAS (KHAZAELI, SAMIRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/13 10:03 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 2/2/2023 .) (PTO 17 emailed to Jason Epps, counsel of record.) (djb)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 01/13 9:57 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (Emailed to Jason Epps, The Gori Law Firm, counsel of record for plaintiffs) (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 01/13 9:29 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-03124. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-184) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
9 9 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:4 Notice of Removal,. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
8 8 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Jason B. Epps as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-3124 JRT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-] lated Cases, Non-MDL
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re4 Notice of Removal,5 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9964094) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/21/2022 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/21/2022 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9963436) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/21/2022 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/13/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet