New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:14-cv-07912
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2014
Terminated:Jun 09, 2015
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 11:18 AM EDT
Defendant
"John Does" 1-10
Represented By
Christopher Michael Luzecky
Law Offices Of Chris Luzecky
contact info
Defendant
Driftstl LLC
Represented By
Christopher Michael Luzecky
Law Offices Of Chris Luzecky
contact info
Defendant
Michael Adam Reed
Represented By
Christopher Michael Luzecky
Law Offices Of Chris Luzecky
contact info
Plaintiff
Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Walter-Michael Lee
Gibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 13, 2015
35 35 misc Sealed Document Mon 07/13 9:39 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
34 34 order Judgment Tue 06/09 5:56 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION UPON CONSENT: It is further ORDERED that in the event that Defendants are ever found by a court of competent jurisdiction, after notice and opportunity to be heard, to be in violation of this Final Judgment the parties agree that (a) Rolex will be entitled to all normal relief which it may request from the court; and (b) Rolex will be entitled to recover any and all future and additional damages, fees and costs incurred by Rolex due to Defendants' violation of this Final Judgment, and judgment shall be entered against Defendants in that full amount. It is further ORDERED that any act by Defendants in violation of the terms or conditions of this Final Judgment may be considered and prosecuted as contempt of this Court. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/09/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 06/05 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Settlement Conference held on 6/5/2015. Stip Judgment due 6/9.Settled (Gray, Diane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
33 33 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 06/04 12:38 PM
ORDER denying31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Request DENIED - bring another Rolex business person and/or have Mr. Brokate on the phone (he should call 212-805-0036 at the time of the conference). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/4/2015) (tn)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/04 12:23 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Christopher M. Luzecky dated June 3, 2015 re:31 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from MAJA SZUMARSKA dated JUNE 3, 2015. . Document filed by "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed. (Luzecky, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
31 31 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 06/03 6:05 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from MAJA SZUMARSKA dated JUNE 3, 2015. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Szumarska, Maja)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Memo Endorsement Wed 06/03 4:48 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:29 Letter regarding Settlement Conference, filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Bring a Rolex business person also. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/3/2015) Copies Sent By Chambers. (spo)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Letter Wed 06/03 2:32 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Maja Szumarska dated 6/3/2015 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Szumarska, Maja)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2015
28 28 misc Letter Fri 05/29 9:34 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Christopher M. Luzecky dated May 29, 2015 re: Rolex Watch USA, Inc. v. Michael Adam Reed, et al. Case No.: 14-cv-7912. Document filed by "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed.(Luzecky, Christopher)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Fri 05/29 4:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Maja Szumarska dated 5/29/2015 re: Settlement Conference. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Szumarska, Maja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/28 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maja Szumarska on behalf of Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Szumarska, Maja)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2015
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/04 5:42 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Counsel attending the conference must have full settlement authority and their client(s) must be present at the conference, as must a representative of the client's insurance company where the decision to settle and/or amount of settlement must be approved by the insurance company. Counsel shall provide a confidential settlement memorandum to my chambers. The memorandum shall not be filed with the Clerk of the Court nor provided to opposing counsel. The memorandum should explain the factual and legal background of the case as it impacts on settlement negotiations; the status of prior settlement discussions between the parties; and the party's settlement proposal (range). See Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 5/4/2015) (tn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
24 24 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/24 12:06 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/24/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Fri 04/24 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/24/2015. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendants' counsel appeared via telephone. The Court will enter an order referring the case to Magistrate Judge Peck for settlement purposes. Plaintiff is directed to provide the Court with a status report upon completion of settlement discussions. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
23 23 respoth Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Wed 04/22 4:55 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,, . Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 respoth Reply Affidavit in Support (non-motion) Wed 04/22 4:53 PM
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Walter-Michael Lee in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
21 21 order Endorsed Letter ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/22 11:39 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher M. Luzecky dated 4/21/2015 re: Defendants' and its counsel request to appear by telephone in the hearing to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in default for failing to plead or otherwise defend this action and a default judgment entered. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/22/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
20 20 respoth Declaration in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 04/17 4:55 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Adam Reed in Opposition re:19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. Document filed by "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed.(Luzecky, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
19 19 respoth Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 04/17 4:41 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION BY DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS . Document filed by "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed. (Luzecky, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/10 2:48 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Christopher Michael Luzecky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 04/10 8:25 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 FIRST MOTION for Christopher M. Luzecky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10799840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/09 6:44 PM
FIRST MOTION for Christopher M. Luzecky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10799840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed.(Luzecky, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificates of Good Standing
Friday, April 03, 2015
16 16 order Endorsed Letter ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/03 1:45 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Adam Reed dated 4/2/2015 re: Defendants request an extension of time of the Order to Show Cause dated March 26, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Show Cause Hearing shall be held on April 24, 2015, at 10 am. (Show Cause Hearing set for 4/24/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/2015) (tn)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Fri 04/03 12:30 PM
ORDER. On April 1, 2015, Defendant Michael Adam Reed ("Mr. Reed" or "Defendant") sent my courtroom deputy an e-mail ex parte that did not concern a purely administrative matter. Mr. Reed is advised that communications with the Court ex parte are improper. Mr. Reed is directed to include opposing counsel on any future communications with the Court. The Court will take no action with respect to the information provided by Defendant. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk Fri 04/03 12:31 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:15 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rjm)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by Certified Mail Fri 04/03 12:42 PM
Mailed a copy of15 Order, to Michael Adam Reed a/k/a Adam Reed 1600 Locust Street, #511 Saint Louis, MO 63103. (soh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/03 1:46 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/22/2015. Show Cause Response due by 4/17/2015. (tn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
14 14 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 03/27 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and supporting papers served on Michael Adam Reed a/k/a Adam Reed and DRIFTSTL, LLC on 3/26/2015. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Fri 03/27 1:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,, . Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Fri 03/27 1:25 PM
DECLARATION of Marc Esposito in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Fri 03/27 1:24 PM
DECLARATION of Walter-Michael Lee in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Thursday, March 26, 2015
10 10 order Order to Show Cause Thu 03/26 12:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED, that Defendants show cause before this Court at 40 Foley Square, Courtroom 619, New York, NY on April 10, 2015 at 12:00 o'clock p.m., or as soon thereafter as counsel can be heard, why Defendants should not be held in default for failing to plead or otherwise defend this action and a default judgment entered; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants' written opposition to this Order to Show Cause, if any, be served by or on April 3, 2015; and that Rolex's reply, if any, be served on or before April 8, 2015. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/10/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/26/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 03/03 2:59 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Driftstl LLC, inssued on March 3, 2015. (dt)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 03/03 2:58 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Michael Adam, inssued on March 3, 2015. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
7 7 order Endorsed Letter Fri 02/13 3:09 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Lee dated 2/12/2015 re: Request to limit Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint to fourteen (14) days. ENDORSEMENT: *See Endorsement, pg. 2* Defendant's time to answer the complaint is extended to Friday, February 27, 2015. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/13/2015) (spo)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/13 3:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Driftstl LLC(collectively) answer due 2/27/2015. Driftstl LLC(individually) answer due 2/27/2015. Michael Adam Reed answer due 2/27/2015. (spo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 09, 2015
6 6 order Endorsed Letter Mon 02/09 6:14 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Adam Reed dated 2/9/2015 re: request for extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is directed to respond to this letter by 5:00 pm Friday, February 13, 2015. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/9/2015) (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 15, 2014
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/15 3:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Adam Reed waiver sent on 11/5/2014, answer due 1/5/2015. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/10 2:46 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Driftstl LLC(collectively) served on 10/21/2014, answer due 11/12/2014. Service was accepted by Carolyn Cook, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Lee, Walter-Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 30, 2014
3 3 order Standing Order re Complex Civil Cases Wed 10/01 11:51 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/01 11:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/01 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT against "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401106191)Document filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc..(moh) (moh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/1/2014) Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 (10/1/2014) Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 (10/1/2014) Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 (10/1/2014) Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 (10/1/2014) Exhibit 5
service Summons Issued Wed 10/01 11:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to "John Does" 1-10, Driftstl LLC(collectively), Driftstl LLC(individually), Michael Adam Reed. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 10/01 11:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 10/01 11:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Trademark Form (case opening) Wed 10/01 11:54 AM
Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (moh)
Related: [-]